Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kawe Mahara Queer Archives Aotearoa Trust
Formerly Lesbian and Gay Archives of New Zealand: Te Pūranga Takatāpui o Aotearoa Trust (LAGANZ)
CC27707
9429042777984
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The Lesbian and Gay Archives of New Zealand Trust 30/06/2008
Lesbian and Gay Archives of New Zealand: Te Pūranga Takatāpui o Aotearoa Trust 11/02/2009
Kawe Mahara Queer Archives Aotearoa Trust 16/05/2024

Address for service

70 Molesworth Street
C/o Alexander Turnbull Library, National Library
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 462 3972
https://www.facebook.com/kawemahara
https://www.instagram.com/kawemahara


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Kaupapa of the Trust's charitable purposes: (a) Provide an archival repository for the materials and taonga of queer people and the archives of queer organisations, and for related materials and taonga of historical and cultural value; (b) Actively and respectfully collect, preserve and make available for research purposes, and creative and communal use the historical and cultural materials and taonga of queer people, groups and organisations; (c) Publish information, and provide public education and accessible opportunities to engage with the collections and learn about queer kaupapa and people, including any intersectional identities they may hold; (d) Collaborate closely with diverse queer communities and archival organisations and institutions; (e) Provide advisory services to assist queer people, groups and organisations to establish, preserve and organise their archives to deposit with Kawe Mahara or other institutions.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Archives & Repository), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Other (please state)

(Archives & Research), Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(Lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, takatapui, fafafine, queer communities), Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, General public

Entity Structure

The Trust is governed by a Board of Trustees comprising up to 10 members who are usually drawn from New Zealand's LGBTTFIQ communities. "LGBTTFIQ" means any person who identifies as lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, takatapui, fa'afafine, intersex or queer and is intended to include any same-sex attracted, transgender or intersex members of any indigenous community of the Pacific.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This Charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under section 43 of the Chaarities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 27/02/2025 $17,012 $11,717 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 28/12/2023 $18,082 $11,518 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 15/02/2023 $7,323 $9,360 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 8/02/2022 $27,003 $12,520 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 10/09/2020 $5,686 $7,113 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 10/02/2020 $2,885 $7,399 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 19/10/2018 $5,778 $9,016 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 22/02/2018 $6,104 $5,768 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 22/02/2018 $3,217 $5,414 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 12/10/2015 $5,026 $2,796 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Theresa Mary Peters Trustee 11/02/2025
Alison Suzanne Day Trustee 10/12/2024
Lori Leigh Trustee 10/12/2024
Rosina Kearaki Scott-Fyfe Trustee - Secretary 13/02/2024
Will Owen Amy Hansen Trustee 13/02/2018
Elizabeth Anne Kerekere Trustee - Chair 12/04/2007
Roger William Swanson Trustee 18/04/2002
Gavin Stuart Hamilton Trustee - Treasurer 26/08/1999

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mani Bruce Mitchell Trustee 7/12/2024
Clare Veronica O'Leary Trustee 13/08/2024
Donal Griffin Raethel Trustee 6/08/2024
Fiona Romayne Campbell Clark Trustee 26/04/2024
Kevin James Haunui Trustee - Chair 5/12/2023
Roger Macdonald Smith Trustee 9/08/2022
Aliyah Grace Winter Trustee 20/10/2020
Howard Pond Trustee 11/08/2020
Valda Rose Edyvane Trustee 25/08/2015
Patricia Jean Rosier Trustee 12/06/2014
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/05/2024 NOC023
16/05/2024 NOC022
28/02/2024 NOC021
9/12/2023 NOC019
8/06/2021 NOC016
22/02/2018 NOC011
20/02/2018 NOC008
12/10/2015 NOC007
8/10/2013 AR006
14/08/2012 NOC003
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.