Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Barbershop Foundation Of New Zealand
CC27800
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

541B South Titirangi Road
Titirangi
Auckland
0604

Charity's other details

021732040


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide a fund from which scholarships and grants can be made to assist in the further training in the singing genre of Barbershop.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Education / training / research

Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising

Other (please state)

(Active members of Barbershop Harmony New Zealand)

Entity Structure

The Foundation is governed by a Trust deed that appoints three trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 8/07/2023 $11,060 $10,482 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 22/11/2022 $11,855 $13,561 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 20/08/2021 $7,590 $1,487 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 5/10/2020 $9,397 $2,767 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 13/07/2019 $8,614 $3,685 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 20/11/2018 $8,663 $3,638 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 25/09/2017 $9,141 $3,689 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 11/04/2017 $10,604 $5,606 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 11/04/2017 $11,944 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John Edward Thornton Denton Trustee 30/09/2012
Harold Victor Henderson Trustee 28/03/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Edward Douglas Langford Trustee 18/06/2024
David George Birdling Trustee 30/09/2012
Ian Stanley Jenkins Trustee 28/04/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/07/2024 NOC017
22/10/2019 NOC012
22/10/2019 NOC011
22/01/2013 AR005
20/12/2012 NOC003
29/03/2012 AR004
25/05/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.