Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Onehunga Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses, Auckland
CC28166
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
August 31

Address for service

PO Box 13151
Onehunga
Auckland
1643
30 Hall Avenue
Mangere
Auckland
2022

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The practice and advancement of the Christian religion founded on the Holy Bible as understood by the denomination of Christians known as Jehovah’s Witnesses, including through the provision or support of a public place of worship known as a Kingdom Hall to facilitate Bible study programs and lectures.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Our Congregation operates a non-profit charity. Individuals meeting the qualifying criteria set forth in our congregation rules are designated as members of the charity. The temporal secular affairs of the charity are administered by a Committee appointed from among its members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 28 February 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 28 February 2010

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2024 28/02/2025 8/02/2025 $35,345 $34,621 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2023 29/02/2024 1/02/2024 $25,871 $25,398 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2022 28/02/2023 25/02/2023 $23,034 $23,759 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2021 28/02/2022 20/02/2022 $27,685 $26,717 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2020 28/02/2021 25/02/2021 $28,515 $28,937 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2019 29/02/2020 20/02/2020 $18,225 $14,340 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2018 28/02/2019 23/12/2018 $13,064 $12,128 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2017 28/02/2018 10/12/2017 $9,844 $16,428 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2016 28/02/2017 16/02/2017 $12,655 $15,731 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2015 29/02/2016 20/02/2016 $17,706 $9,945 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Duane Harley Committee Member 19/08/2024
William Tran Committee member 14/12/2019
Barry McFarlane Brown Committee Member 1/09/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Richard Mehana Committee Member 19/08/2024
Ian Green Committee Member 1/05/2023
Matthew Nua Committee Member 14/12/2019
Seth Rogerson Committee Member 31/08/2019
Matthew Eichler Committee Member 13/05/2019
Mark Rapira Committee Member 30/09/2018
Matthew Nua Service Overseer 26/05/2015
William Henry Flett Secretary 26/05/2015
Hamish Frost Coordinator 31/12/2014
Richard Grenville Stone Service Overseer 31/12/2012
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/12/2019 NOC016
30/10/2019 NOC015
5/07/2019 NOC014
10/12/2018 NOC012
28/11/2017 NOC010
26/05/2015 NOC008
19/02/2015 NOC007
27/02/2013 NOC004
21/11/2011 AR004
30/10/2011 NOC003
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.