Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Whare Roimata Trust
Te Whare Roimata Trading Company T/A Stanmore Book & Post
CC28707
9429042919568
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 32129
Linwood
Christchurch
8147
274 Gloucester Street
Linwood
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

03 3795134
03 3655191


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Te Whare Roimata Trust works with people on limited incomes living in the Eastern Inner city neighbourhoods and urban Maori to develop affordable Treaty-based grassroot, neighbourhood-solutions to the issues faced with the aim of creating a stronger, more inclusive, just and / sustainable community better able to respond and meet its own needs.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Tangihanga

Community development

Education / training / research, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Whanau Development

General public

Eastern Inner city residents

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 28/02/2025 8/04/2025 $570,945 $544,379 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 5/04/2024 4/04/2024 $527,384 $497,465 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/03/2023 16/05/2023 $671,349 $666,491 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/03/2022 16/05/2022 $715,516 $691,766 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 21/05/2021 13/06/2021 $624,383 $626,905 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/03/2020 10/05/2020 $742,276 $738,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/03/2019 10/06/2019 $546,789 $531,490 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 30/04/2018 30/10/2018 $485,623 $463,660 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 30/03/2017 $343,416 $314,038 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 8/03/2016 $822,917 $362,793 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Amanda Linda Cook Trustee 17/02/2025
Te Inupo Farrar Trustee 3/02/2025
Naiti Ned Rua Pari Trustee 28/07/2023
Daniela Orsola Bagozzi Trustee 27/03/2023
Te Herehere Shirley Tukaki Trustee 4/12/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Raylee Kane Trustee 29/03/2024
Jennifer Jean Smith Trustee 27/03/2023
Hotorene Tawatawa Hepi Trustee 26/02/2016
Martin Maguire Trustee 10/03/2014
Elizabeth Jane Rossiter Trustee 4/12/2012
Te Aroha Te Poono Trustee 4/12/2012
Johnny Manuel Trustee 28/05/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/01/2025 NOC017
4/07/2023 NOC015
6/01/2018 NOC008
25/07/2016 NOC006
3/03/2015 NOC005
22/12/2012 NOC001
30/12/2011 AR004
6/01/2011 AR003
21/12/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.