pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Christian Resource Centre International
Resonate, Christian Resources, CR Stock, CR Market, CR on demand
CC28743
9429042619093
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
January 31

Address for service

11 Lancaster Street
Hampden
9410

Charity's other details

021 027 56380


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The mission of Christian Resource Centre International is to provide communication resources to make Christ known worldwide. It’s purpose is to: (a) Propagate the Christian Gospel by means of the preaching thereof, teaching the Bible by all means but not limited to publication, books, radio, television broadcasting, video recording and films; (b) Provide training instructions and practical experience in evangelism and the propagation and teaching of the Christian Gospel of Jesus Christ for men, women and young people; (c) Help and encourage interest in evangelism and missionary enterprise within the Christian Church; (d) Preach and teach the Scriptures including their application to all areas of life and conduct; (e) Minister in all contexts and by all means the life and power of God, and facilitate the same through the providing of, or assisting to provide, the necessary means and resources to accomplish these objectives; (f) Promote such other religious and charitable purposes

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Trust is a stand alone entity. The Trust is governed by the Board of Trustees who is responsible for the administration, management and investment of the Trust funds.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/12/2023 4/10/2023 $46,217 $67,996
31/10/2022 1/11/2022 $63,124 $34,268
31/07/2021 3/08/2021 $34,130 $31,251
31/10/2020 9/09/2020 $91,309 $30,711
31/10/2019 13/08/2019 $134,943 $32,787
31/10/2018 30/10/2018 $73,766 $24,448
31/07/2017 17/08/2017 $124,838 $312,240
31/07/2016 28/07/2016 $386,825 $403,589
31/07/2015 30/07/2015 $350,860 $334,328
31/07/2014 30/07/2014 $409,800 $366,824

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alison Gwyneth Bare Trustee 20/11/2023
Michael Lloyd Bare Trustee 20/11/2023
Andrew Dickson Trustee 1/02/2023
Mike Chisholm Trustee 1/03/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nicholas John Hitchins Trustee 13/02/2023
Nicholas John Hitchins Trustee 13/02/2023
Arthur Warner Trustee 31/12/2022
George Alexander Fairservice Trustee 1/03/2017
Graeme Keith Marshall Trustee 1/03/2017
David John Lindsay Trustee 9/12/2014
Dion Samuel Stevenson Trustee 9/12/2014
Neil Gordon Prier Trustee 15/02/2012
Stephen Wayne Bell Trustee 8/11/2011
Bevan George Burgess Trustee 27/04/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/11/2023 NOC026
19/01/2023 NOC024
17/12/2022 NOC023
17/12/2022 NOC022
17/12/2022 NOC021
17/12/2022 NOC020
10/12/2020 NOC017
10/12/2020 NOC016
1/08/2016 NOC010
1/08/2016 NOC009

Charity Documents