Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Fire Service Support Unit
Wellington Operational Support
CC28959
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 14139
Kilbirnie
Wellington
6241
7 Troy Street
1 Troy Street
Kilbirnie
Wellington
6022

Charity's other details

www.facebook.com/WellingtonFireSupport


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Wellington Fire Service Support Unit is a dedicated team of volunteers supporting Fire and Emergency New Zealand and our community, when they need it most, through specialised skills, techniques, and equipment.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Emergency / disaster relief

Education / training / research, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Entity Structure

The the assigned General Manager, Fire and Emergency New Zealand, acting as Wellington Fire Service Support Unit's Chief Fire Officer, appoints the Officer in Charge. The Officer in Charge acts as the Chair of the Management Committee and appoints the committee's Deputy, Secretary, and Treasurer. A Fire Fighter's Representative is elected annually by member Fire Fighters and is also appointed to the Management Committee.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 4/10/2023 $11,575 $11,109 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 19/06/2022 $10,443 $7,993 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 27/09/2021 $7,947 $8,826 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 13/12/2020 $11,668 $10,470 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 11/12/2019 $16,177 $15,316 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 19/12/2018 $13,449 $7,412 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 28/02/2018 14/02/2018 $11,336 $6,378 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 18/04/2017 $9,987 $5,837 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 4/02/2016 $9,955 $5,914 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 18/09/2015 $10,458 $5,148 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 9 months from 1 July 2020 to 31 March 2021.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Stephen John Lambert Treasurer 25/09/2023
Johnathan Steven Ashman Station Officer (SO) 17/10/2016
Philip Julian Harris Second in Command (SO) 15/10/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Catherine F Coe Secretary 25/09/2023
Todd Malcolm Skilton Treasurer 13/06/2022
Colin George Larsen Secretary 20/09/2021
Mark Stuart Foster Station Officer, Secretary 15/02/2021
Norman John Patrick Kelly Station Officer Treasurer 6/11/2020
Brian Maxwell Arons Officer in Charge (SSO) 17/10/2016
Sandy Graeme Lawson Secretary 1/03/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/09/2021 NOC015
8/03/2021 NOC014
8/03/2021 NOC013
27/02/2018 NOC009
20/01/2017 NOC006
6/12/2012 AR005
21/04/2011 AR003
5/08/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.