Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Titoki Healing Centre Trust
CC29185
9429042879091
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

71 Titoki Road
RD 2
Whakatane
3192

Charity's other details

07 308 6503


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Titoki Healing Centre Trust was established in June 1976 to provide a place of retreat, spiritual healing, time out and restoration. The Centre is interdenominational and is open to all people, irrespective of faith, religion or religious belief. Healing counselling is offered to those requesting it. Titoki also provides respite care to carers and beneficiaries alike. Regular engagements occur for Hauora entities to send those needing assistance to Titoki.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Social services, Emotional And Spiritual Healing

General public

Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Titoki is staffed by four full time unpaid volunteers. Duties include counselling, office attendance, housekeeping, kitchen duties, grounds care and liaising with guests. In addition, a number of unpaid volunteers visit the Centre each week to provide further assistance. From time to time, paid staff are employed for specific tasks. Income is by way of guest fees and donations and, from time to time, bequests and occasionally, community trusts. The Trust is governed by a Board of Trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/09/2024 25/09/2024 $179,808 $163,164 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 7/08/2023 1/08/2023 $127,520 $143,083 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 31/08/2022 28/07/2022 $119,199 $106,452 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 5/05/2021 $67,177 $82,049 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 18/06/2020 $110,290 $95,959 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 30/05/2019 $94,412 $95,300 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 18/04/2018 $165,157 $107,954 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 29/06/2017 $117,750 $103,023 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 5/07/2016 $83,720 $86,470 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Brad Haimona Trustee 4/04/2025
Peter Gossman Trustee 28/05/2024
Philippa Adam Chairperson 1/04/2023
Cynthia Ruth Williams Trustee 13/10/2021
John Michael Rothery Trustee 13/10/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lucky Vinny Te Koha Trustee 28/05/2024
Hayley Te Koha Trustee 31/12/2023
Jason Joshua Jackson Trustee 31/03/2023
Elizabeth Anne Tamblyn Trustee 5/03/2023
Timothy John Jenkinson Trustee 1/04/2022
Anne Doreen Baker Trustee 21/09/2021
Eijmbert Johannes Schoneveld Trustee 17/08/2021
Holly Renee Banks Trustee 20/07/2021
Leanne Mary Growden Trustee 20/07/2021
Paul Joseph Gavin Trustee 18/05/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/04/2025 NOC035
24/06/2024 NOC033
2/06/2024 NOC032
8/01/2024 NOC031
1/05/2023 NOC028
1/05/2023 NOC027
22/03/2023 NOC026
10/12/2022 NOC024
14/05/2022 NOC020
7/04/2022 NOC018
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.