Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Rainbow Hub Waikato Board of Trustees
Rainbow Hub Waikato, RHW, WaQuY, Waikato Queer Youth
CC29356
9429043151325
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Waikato Queer Youth 30/06/2008
Rainbow Hub Waikato 4/06/2021
Rainbow Hub Waikato Board of Trustees 12/05/2025

Address for service

36 Bryce Street
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 8399039
@RainbowHubWaikato
@RainbowHubWKO
@RainbowHubWaikato


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To improve the health and wellbeing of people diverse gender, sex, and sexualities through education, 1:1 Support, referrals to rainbow-friendly and knowledgeable connections, and providing safe spaces where social peer-to-peer support reduces isolation and foster validation, connection and holistic empowerment.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Promotion of volunteering

Other (please state)

(Rainbow community, Communities seeking knowledge in supporting Rainbow communities, Families and children)

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 25/09/2024 $397,643 $526,251 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 28/09/2023 $477,544 $459,491 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 21/09/2022 $414,834 $228,358 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 4/07/2021 $139,165 $81,492 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 29/01/2020 $85,135 $68,459 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 29/01/2020 $52,890 $47,378 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 3/09/2018 $41,470 $41,497 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 24/07/2017 $42,616 $38,136 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 31/05/2016 $24,570 $24,443 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This annual return will cover the financial period between1 January 2021- 31 March 2022 (15 months) due to a balance date change.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lillian Amber Glass Treasurer 13/03/2024
Louise Elizabeth Ratcliffe Secretary 10/05/2023
Sarah Joy Morrison Co-chairperson 12/04/2023
Penelope Danger Boyce Co-chairperson 3/08/2021
Nathan Dashing Bramwell Director 7/05/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Esmarelda Entrapta Reid Co-chairperson 21/02/2025
Shengjun Jin Co-chair 15/08/2024
Carley Bereny Co-chair 8/05/2024
Shayne Klinkhamer Secretary 8/05/2024
Mitchell Marc Jordan Secretary 13/12/2023
Stacey Leigh Bond Trustee 13/12/2023
Anna Joy O'Dea Trustee 12/07/2023
Raynar Drassin Kit Humphries Trustee 8/03/2023
Casey Rachelle Katherine Stokes trustee 15/02/2023
Chloe Anne Kay Board Member 15/02/2023
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/05/2025 NOC044
27/02/2025 NOC043
4/12/2024 NOC042
26/11/2024 NOC041
23/10/2024 NOC040
25/09/2024 NOC039
24/07/2024 NOC037
20/05/2024 NOC035
22/04/2024 NOC034
7/11/2023 NOC033
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.