pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Hounds 4 Homes Incorporated
CC29400
9429043037797
Deregistered
30/09/2019

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Hounds 4 Homes Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

70 Bay Road
Oxford
7430

Charity's other details

03 3121699
03 3121699


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We work to increase the number of greyhounds rehomed after racing. We encourage prospective adopters and ensure that they understand greyhounds and their needs.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Care / protection of animals

Education / training / research, Health, Sport / recreation, People with disabilities

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

The Board consisting of the President, Treasurer and Secretary and any other Officers deemed necessary. The Board has charge of the full administration of the affairs and business of the Society.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 11/09/2019 $7,365 $7,904
30/09/2018 7/09/2018 $8,829 $13,263
30/09/2017 8/08/2017 $16,169 $12,839
30/09/2016 3/07/2016 $13,021 $11,739
30/09/2015 5/08/2015 $6,602 $6,746
30/09/2014 11/08/2014 $6,613 $6,745
30/09/2013 30/09/2013 $8,088 $2,926
30/09/2012 9/07/2012 $5,642 $3,781
30/09/2011 3/08/2011 $4,150 $4,951
30/09/2010 9/08/2010 $4,150 $4,951

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anna Louise Morten Committee Member 10/05/2018
Jackie Foot Committee Member 12/02/2011
Fay Le Couteur Committee Member 26/07/2008
Richard Mahoney Committee member 15/07/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jo Robertson Committee Member 5/05/2018
Jesse Schell Committee Member 10/11/2011
Donna O'Malley Treasurer 12/02/2011
Joanna Robertson Secretary 6/08/2010
Colleen Cairns Committee member 31/03/2010
Heather Cairns Committee Member 31/03/2010
Lynda Raina Committee member 31/03/2010
Patricia Elizabeth Jack Committee Member 31/03/2010
Paula Howe Committee Member 31/03/2010
Penny Harnett Committee Member 31/03/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/05/2018 NOC013
9/05/2012 NOC008
3/08/2011 NOC007
16/02/2011 NOC006
16/02/2011 NOC005
9/08/2010 NOC004
9/08/2010 NOC003
9/08/2010 AR003
4/11/2009 AR002
19/09/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents