pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Aotearoa New Zealand Peace And Conflict Studies Centre Trust
N/A
CC29419
9429043056187
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

10 Onslow Avenue
Epsom
Auckland
1023

Charity's other details

0274850185


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

to support the establishment of a Chair at Otago University or the study of Peace and Conflict issues

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(University Peace Studies Support/Peace Education Schools), Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research

Other (please state)

(Peace Studies), Education / training / research, International activities

Other (please state)

(University Students and Peace Researchers), General public

Entity Structure

A trust comprising trustees to support the Establishment of a chair in Peace studies

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 27/04/2023 $50,000 $232
30/09/2022 28/08/2022 $0 $1,543
30/09/2021 23/07/2021 $50,304 $50,120
31/10/2020 23/10/2020 $1,102 $86
31/10/2019 22/10/2019 $1,097 $367
30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $100,009 $105,919
30/09/2017 17/11/2017 $10,014 $989
30/09/2016 4/11/2016 $3,000 $6,000
30/09/2015 24/10/2015 $216,000 $217,000
30/09/2014 1/10/2014 $506,000 $512,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David John Moxon TRUSTEE 24/06/2019
Janfrie Julia Wakim Trustee 24/06/2019
Sharon Anne Elizabeth Wadsworth Trustee 24/06/2019
Jennifer Louise Plane Te Paa Daniel Trustee 27/10/2016
Marjory Elizabeth Lewis Trustee 11/04/2011
Peter Wills Trustee 11/04/2011
Maui Ashley Solomon Trustee 9/03/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Margaret Ann Bedggood Trustee 29/11/2019
Christopher Barfoot Trustee 3/07/2019
Don Smart Trustee 26/06/2019
Keith Locke Trustee 16/06/2019
Treasa Moira Dunworth Trustee 29/07/2012
Dorothy Fay Brown Trustee 28/11/2011
Anne Mary Ackerman Trustee 11/04/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/03/2020 NOC011
30/09/2014 NOC006
31/10/2012 NOC003
30/12/2011 NOC002
28/10/2011 AR004
30/11/2010 AR003
24/12/2009 AR002

Charity Documents