Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pahi Reserve Society Incorporated
Pahi Beach Holiday Park
CC29432
9429042869641
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

636 Pahi Road
RD 1
Pahi
Paparoa
0571

Charity's other details

09 4317 083
n/a
n/a
n/a
n/a


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Society provides day to day management and maintains the public land at Pahi for all to use and enjoy,

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Camping Ground Administration And Maintenance For District Council), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Sport / recreation

Accommodation / housing, Management Preservation For The Public To Enjoy / Management Of Campsite

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, People with disabilities, Holiday Makers And Transiting Visitors

Entity Structure

Pahi Reserve Society is an incorporated society set up to manage the Pahi Reserve and environs to provide management, preservation and protection for the reserve for the benefit and enjoyment of the public. It consists of an elected committee of nine members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by the 31st of December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by the 31st of December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 6/11/2024 $127,001 $111,752 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 10/10/2023 $110,560 $120,063 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 19/10/2022 $99,384 $100,123 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 4/11/2021 $105,674 $114,703 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 10/10/2020 $110,942 $93,893 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 19/10/2019 $103,217 $99,884 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 17/11/2018 $104,404 $111,572 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 5/10/2017 $104,515 $91,853 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 13/12/2016 $93,153 $70,929 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 24/09/2015 $80,752 $74,117 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John Robert Black Committee Member 6/11/2024
Gaewyn Pook Committee Member 1/12/2020
Gabriella Furjes Secretary/Treasurer 28/10/2018
Alan Reynolds Chairman 17/09/2017
Paul Brian Campbell Vice chariman 17/09/2017
Jennifer Ann MacKinnon Committee Member 28/09/2014
Robin Brett Cooksey Committee Member 28/09/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mike Donald Committee member 1/12/2023
William Pook committee member 30/06/2020
Eveline Fay Wilson Committee Member 18/10/2019
Lorraine Richardson Committee Member 18/10/2019
David Angus Wilson Chairperson 28/10/2018
Jennifer Fenwick Secretary/ Treasurer 28/10/2018
Ralph Harold Williams Committee member 28/10/2018
Kerry Douglas Bonham Committee Member 17/09/2017
Margaret Gibson Committee Member 17/09/2017
David Hayward Committee Member 20/09/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/10/2023 NOC024
18/10/2022 NOC022
3/12/2020 NOC020
1/12/2020 NOC019
19/10/2019 NOC017
22/11/2018 NOC015
8/11/2018 NOC013
8/11/2018 NOC012
16/10/2017 NOC011
2/10/2014 NOC008
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.