Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Abilities Incorporated
Abilities Group
CC29453
9429042573128
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

91 Hillside Road
Glenfield
Auckland
0627

Charity's other details

09 444 0611


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

seeks to “Enrich the lives of people with disabilities”. We achieve this through creating meaningful work opportunities for people with disabilities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provide Employment for people with disabilities EWaste, Cardboard and Polystyrene Recycling)

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Social services, Employment, Fund-raising, Employment of Disabled Persons

People with disabilities

Children / young people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Abilities Incorporated is an Incorporated Society registered under the Incorporated Societies Act 1908 and a not-for-profit organisation. The society has a constitution and is governed by a Board of Directors. The day to day management of the society is carried out by the Managing Director and a management team of 5, including the Operations Manager and Accountant. The accounts of the society are audited each year by an independent auditor.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 Dec 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 Dec 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 5/12/2024 $5,522,376 $5,227,659 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 6/12/2023 $4,400,839 $4,444,742 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 2/12/2022 $4,787,054 $4,137,207 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 20/12/2021 $6,635,435 $3,749,746 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 26/11/2020 $3,678,938 $3,319,717 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 5/11/2019 $3,044,296 $3,183,729 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 13/11/2018 $3,122,498 $3,030,329 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 17/11/2017 $3,107,845 $3,036,859 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 28/11/2016 $3,077,807 $2,967,410 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 5/11/2015 $2,981,867 $2,847,855 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michael McCook Director 30/01/2024
Mike Law Director 21/02/2023
Michelle Bennett Director 21/07/2015
John Waugh Director 31/03/2012
Peter Fraher Managing Director 14/04/2004

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Fred Aandewiel Director 28/11/2023
John Pringle Director 28/11/2023
Susie Wood Director 18/04/2023
Peter Doland Secretary 21/02/2023
Reg Birchfield Director 19/04/2016
Nigel John Hall Director 22/03/2016
Sarah Brosnahan Director 30/09/2014
Rob Johnston Director 31/01/2013
Reg Birchfield Director 21/12/2012
Elizabeth Francis Valintine Director 30/06/2011
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/07/2024 NOC019
11/05/2023 NOC017
4/10/2016 NOC009
5/08/2015 NOC008
16/11/2012 AR005
9/06/2012 NOC004
30/06/2011 NOC003
15/11/2010 AR003
4/08/2010 NOC002
3/12/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.