Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Laura Fergusson Trust Incorporated
CC29785
9429042779698
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The Laura Fergusson Trust For Disabled Persons (Auckland) Incorporated 30/06/2008
Laura Fergusson Trust Incorporated 12/05/2010

Address for service

PO Box 17045
Greenlane
Auckland
1546
52 Symonds Street
Level 3
Auckland
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

09 524 0537


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Laura Fergusson Trust Incorporated Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Laura Fergusson Trust Incorporated
The Joyce Fisher Endowment Fund Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide support for people with congenital, acquired or accidental disabilities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Disability Rehabilitation

People with disabilities

Health, Fund-raising, Disability Rehabilitation

People with disabilities

General public

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
The Joyce Fisher Endowment Fund Trust CC52980

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 15/01/2024 $1,766,000 $2,614,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 23/12/2022 $6,037,000 $2,535,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 23/12/2021 $516,000 $2,651,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 10/12/2020 $8,719,000 $11,070,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 10/12/2019 $11,747,000 $12,797,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 29/11/2018 $11,436,000 $11,696,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 22/02/2018 $10,782,000 $11,000,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 24/11/2016 $11,489,000 $11,134,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 8/12/2015 $11,797,957 $11,395,748 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Simon Fraser Dunlop Chairperson 9/01/2024
Gregory Bernard Horton Member of Board of Management 29/11/2023
Michael James Bishop Member of Board of Management 29/11/2023
Michael John Fisher Member of Board of Management 29/11/2023
Philippa Joy Atkinson Member of Board of Management 29/11/2023
Sophia Grace Malthus Member of Board of Management 29/11/2023
Linda Maree Smeele Deputy Chairperson 1/02/2023

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Victoria Mary Carter Chairperson 10/02/2025
Brett Tantrum Member Of Board of Management 29/11/2023
Gary McMurray Member Of Board of Management 29/11/2023
Heather Ann McLeish Member of Board of Management 29/11/2023
John William Burton Deputy Chairperson, Board of Management 29/11/2023
Patricia Neal Member of Board of Management 29/11/2023
Roland John Magness Member Of Board Of Management 29/11/2023
Simon Barclay Chairperson, Board of Management 29/11/2023
Sally Elizabeth Anderson Member Of Board of Management 23/02/2023
Christopher Eric O'Brien Chairman Board Of Management 16/11/2022
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/04/2025 NOC033
19/02/2025 NOC032
10/02/2025 NOC031
28/08/2024 NOC030
15/07/2024 NOC028
1/02/2024 NOC027
25/10/2023 NOC025
20/09/2023 NOC024
6/12/2022 NOC022
6/12/2022 NOC021
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.