Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Sport Manawatu Charitable Trust
Sport Manawatu
CC29800
9429042972389
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 797
Palmerston North Central
Palmerston North
4440
61 Pascal Street
Palmerston North 4410
Palmerston North
4410

Charity's other details

06 357 5349


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Developing play, active recreation, and sport in the wider Manawatu region.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides Recreational Services), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Sport / recreation

Health, Community development, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 20/11/2024 $2,805,566 $2,772,327 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 28/11/2023 $2,842,644 $2,839,101 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 6/11/2022 $2,436,240 $2,396,691 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 3/11/2021 $2,213,642 $2,214,196 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 24/09/2020 $2,108,303 $2,031,145 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 16/10/2019 $2,216,434 $2,153,424 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 19/11/2018 $2,193,732 $2,585,754 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 21/09/2017 $2,259,924 $2,252,713 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 22/11/2016 $2,263,018 $2,243,538 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 3/11/2015 $2,117,725 $2,024,902 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Renee Schalkwijk Trustee 11/12/2023
Lynley Montgomery Trustee 8/05/2023
Jeremy Hapeta Trustee 12/10/2021
Natasha Bailey Trustee 12/10/2021
Sandra Lynch Deputy Chair 22/09/2020
Nathan Hopcroft Chair 20/10/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Dean Taipana Trustee 21/10/2024
Kayla Whitelock Trustee 21/10/2024
Suzanne Charles Trustee 11/12/2023
Danielle Margaret Balmer Trustee 6/11/2023
Rafea Naffa Trustee 6/11/2023
Trevor Shailer CEO 20/05/2022
Barbara Michelle Cameron Trustee 4/04/2022
Shayne Harris Chairperson 12/10/2021
Fenella Devlin Trustee 27/07/2021
Craig Purdy Trustee 22/09/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/12/2024 NOC031
19/08/2024 NOC028
19/08/2024 NOC027
13/05/2022 NOC020
9/11/2021 NOC019
27/05/2021 NOC017
17/04/2018 NOC013
18/10/2017 NOC012
8/12/2016 NOC010
3/11/2015 NOC008
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.