Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Rheumatology Association Incorporated
CC30207
9429042870821
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

Private Bag 4710
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8140
Department of Rheumatology, Christchurch Hospital
2 Riccarton Avenue
Christchurch Central City
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To award fellowships to members and associate members for NZ and/or overseas research or training or training course.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Health, People with disabilities

Other (please state)

(Arthritis patients, researchers), Older people, People with disabilities

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 10/09/2024 $372,286 $205,131 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 20/09/2023 $201,944 $275,069 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 29/10/2022 $123,196 $105,633 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 5/10/2021 $84,814 $74,964 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 2/10/2020 $142,975 $148,801 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $172,320 $242,002 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 26/09/2018 $661,462 $444,368 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $19,413 $34,198 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 22/02/2017 $22,716 $31,122 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Steven Sawyers Executive Officer 19/09/2023
Uri Arad Executive Officer 25/08/2023
Philippa van Dantzig Executive Officer 29/10/2022
Ellen Prendegast Executive Officer 9/08/2022
Estella Yeo Executive Officer 27/09/2021
Hugh De Lautour Executive Officer 27/09/2021
Mark Sapsford Treasurer 5/09/2020
Sarah Jordan Executive Officer 5/09/2020
Vicki Quincey President 22/05/2017
William Taylor Secretary 24/08/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nicola Dalbeth Executive Officer 25/08/2023
Rebecca Grainger Executive Officer 25/08/2023
Michael Corkill Executive Officer 2/09/2022
Tracey Kain Executive Officer 2/09/2022
Lisa Stamp Executive Officer 27/09/2021
Douglas White Secretary 5/09/2020
Jo Mitchell Executive Officer 5/09/2020
The New Zealand Guardian Trust Company Limited Custodian Trustee 16/03/2020
Daniel Ching Executive Officer 6/09/2019
David Porter Treasurer 6/09/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/09/2024 NOC024
16/09/2023 NOC022
28/10/2022 NOC020
14/12/2021 NOC019
14/12/2021 NOC018
5/10/2020 NOC016
26/11/2019 NOC013
26/09/2018 NOC011
1/10/2014 NOC007
9/09/2013 AR006
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.