pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Manawatu Home Educators
CC30262
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Dayspring Christian Academy 30/06/2008
Manawatu Home Educators 8/11/2010

Address for service

PO Box 703
Palmerston North Central
Palmerston North
4440
54 Pascal Street
Palmerston North 4410
Palmerston North
4410

Charity's other details

0277368338


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Purposes of Society 3.1.The purposes of this Society, based on Christian principles and values, are: 3.1.1. To be a supportive network for Home Educators from Manawatu and surrounding regions. 3.1.2. To be a resource hub to members. 3.1.3. Facilitating social and educational activities and events for members. 3.1.4. Do anything necessary or helpful to the above purposes. 3.2.Pecuniary gain is not a purpose of the Society. 3.2.1. The provisions and effect of this clause shall not be removed from this document and shall be included into any document replacing this document.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides resources/activities for Home Educating families)

Education / training / research

Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation

Family / whanau

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Members of MHE elect a committee which includes Chair, Treasurer, Secretary and up to nine other members. All are voluntary positions.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2022 7/06/2022 $26,755 $23,302
30/06/2021 17/04/2021 $12,248 $11,171
30/06/2020 8/06/2020 $16,085 $14,106
30/06/2019 2/04/2019 $16,110 $17,342
30/06/2018 19/06/2018 $17,430 $13,610
30/06/2017 27/06/2017 $16,854 $20,233
30/06/2016 12/06/2016 $24,017 $22,246
30/06/2015 27/07/2015 $16,416 $16,655
30/06/2014 8/10/2014 $20,201 $17,350

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Hayley Smeaton Chairperson 21/04/2022
Natasha Goga Treasurer 7/05/2020
Andrew Turner Secretary 30/04/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Scott Leslie Ridsdale Chair Person 11/05/2021
Jenny Mary Higham Treasurer 7/05/2020
Paul Dekker Treasurer 31/12/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/02/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents