Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Male Voice Choir Incorporated
CC30277
9429042910954
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

40 Spyglass Lane
Whitby
Porirua
5024

Charity's other details

02102701556


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the choir is to foster promote and encourage male voice choral singing. In so doing we present concerts which entertain the paying public, with the result that we can make donations to worthy charities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Choral Singing)

Arts / culture / heritage

Health, Community development, Social services, Religious activities, Sport / recreation, International activities, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Entertainment

General public

Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Religious groups, Wellington Free Ambulance

Entity Structure

The Choir members give their services voluntarily. The Music Director is contracted to the choir. The choir has a written constitution, and has a management committee.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 14/04/2024 $21,043 $24,309 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 8/06/2023 $12,755 $16,099 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 22/06/2022 $11,500 $20,951 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 10/06/2021 $9,939 $16,519 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 31/07/2020 23/07/2020 $10,707 $12,661 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 28/06/2019 $14,276 $15,642 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 31/07/2018 24/07/2018 $9,957 $11,271 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 7/06/2017 $15,001 $11,065 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 31/03/2016 $17,393 $17,141 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gordon Johnson Committee Member 25/03/2021
Lyndsay Boys Treasurer 4/06/2020
Gary John Rogers Secretary 22/03/2018
Leslie Williams President 22/03/2018
Robert Bevan Smith Committee Member 5/02/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mike Hickman Committee Member 1/02/2024
Laurie Smith Committee Member 22/05/2023
Bernard Philpott Committee Member 3/02/2022
Alastair Grant Campbell Committee Member 21/03/2019
Keith Hobden Immediate Past President 21/03/2019
David Bray Committee Member 23/03/2017
Gary Richard Black Treasurer 23/03/2017
Graham Ross Alexander Secretary 23/03/2017
John Hugh Williams Committee Member 23/03/2017
Robert Stuart Walker President 23/03/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/06/2020 NOC013
23/06/2018 NOC010
27/06/2017 NOC008
16/04/2014 NOC006
22/02/2012 AR006
18/03/2011 AR005
16/03/2010 AR004
27/02/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.