Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Auckland Town Hall Organ Trust
Town Hall Organ Trust
CC30369
9429043162680
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

Attn: Caleb Matafeo
PO Box 5749 Victoria Street West
Auckland Central
Auckland
1142

Charity's other details

021-292-4422
www.facebook.com/TownHallOrgan


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust was established in recognition of the musical, aesthetic and heritage value of the Auckland Town Hall Organ and the need for the proper management of the reinstatement of the Organ in the style as originally gifted to Auckland City by Henry Brett, the ongoing repair and maintenance of the Organ and the availability of the Organ for use in events, and by organ students, for the benefit of the public.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provision of concerts on the Auckland Town Hall Organ.

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Fund-raising

General public

Entity Structure

The Trust is responsible, under the terms of the Deed, for the arrangement of periodic free concerts for the benefit of the public together with the responsibility of the collection of donations and the payment of artists' fees and other costs.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

The first annual return due on the 31/12/2008 will cover less than six months after the charity is registered. For this reason the charity should be granted an exemption to filling their first annual return under s41 (1), and the first annual return will be due by the 31/12/2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 29/12/2023 $30,807 $27,800 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 25/11/2022 $26,893 $23,206 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 31/10/2021 $80,175 $80,413 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 30/12/2020 $28,707 $31,908 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 2/01/2020 $50,548 $30,357 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 15/01/2019 $33,679 $30,464 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 17/01/2018 $26,062 $27,538 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 4/12/2016 $19,226 $31,121 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 18/11/2015 $11,755 $26,947 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 8/12/2014 $53,670 $39,567 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Soomin Kim Trustee 28/03/2023
Nicholas Forbes Trustee 31/10/2021
John C Sinclair Trustee 30/08/2017
Matt Pestle Trustee 25/02/2015
Desley Elisabeth C Simpson Trustee 16/03/2011
Kerry Ewan Stevens Trustee 24/08/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Cally McWha Trustee 30/06/2023
Tim McWhannell Trustee 1/11/2022
Derek S Firth Trustee 1/09/2022
Paul Chan Trustee 30/06/2022
Kevin Bishop Trustee 1/06/2022
Richard Leigh Trustee 25/10/2017
Beverley Rogers Trustee 28/06/2017
Benn Winlove Trustee 31/05/2016
Donald Stanley Mackintosh Trott Trustee 9/09/2015
Julian Leigh Redshaw Trustee 30/10/2013
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/07/2023 NOC023
24/11/2022 NOC021
21/09/2017 NOC011
21/09/2017 NOC010
23/05/2016 NOC008
28/07/2015 NOC007
13/08/2013 AR006
25/08/2011 NOC003
14/07/2011 NOC002
9/01/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.