Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Auckland Khmer Buddhist Association Incorporated
CC30442
9429042983613
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

455 Porchester Road
Randwick Park
Auckland
2105

Charity's other details

021 66 55 77


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Unite Cambodian citizens and other who believe in Buddhism and Cambodian culture to practice the concept of Buddhism, in particular those living in New Zealand. Our Mission is also to build Wat Khemaraphirataram temple to meet the need of promoting religious belief and society. To sponsor and support Monks in fulfilling their obligations for Buddhism, Cambodian culture and tradition

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

As above

Arts / culture / heritage

Promote religious activities

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Total of 25 Board Members made up as follows; Honourable President & Wat Founder (Senior Monk) Abbot Board of Directors Executive Committee

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 23/09/2024 $337,729 $76,010 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 4/08/2023 $314,934 $91,621 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 5/07/2022 $263,794 $51,422 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 30/07/2021 $456,414 $66,796 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 9/08/2020 $307,336 $68,041 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 17/07/2019 $357,303 $74,506 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 24/07/2018 $438,160 $109,741 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 20/07/2017 $392,996 $39,556 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 8/07/2016 $391,509 $39,571 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ches Sat Auckland's Senior Monk 8/03/2020
Hay Sohim Monk 8/03/2020
Som Srey Monk 8/03/2020
Kam Koun Chief of Monk 15/04/2018
Kim Khieng Eng Board Member 15/04/2018
Kol Noun Senior Advisor 15/04/2018
Ouk Chhoeun Board Member 15/04/2018
Shannon Sealy Board Member 15/04/2018
Lim Vann Board Memeber 14/04/2018
Sarith Pich Board Member 4/04/2018
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Piseth Meas Secretary 6/09/2024
Lim Vann Senior Advisor 14/04/2018
May Sary Sim 2nd Secretary 9/10/2017
So Him Hay Monk 9/10/2017
Som Srey Monk 9/10/2017
Phy Khut Board Member 4/07/2016
Ches Sat Monk 18/03/2014
Chheang Sean - 18/03/2014
Hau Ly - 18/03/2014
Heang Douch - 18/03/2014
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/03/2020 NOC035
29/03/2019 NOC033
27/03/2019 NOC032
12/07/2018 NOC029
5/05/2018 NOC028
23/10/2017 NOC027
23/10/2017 NOC026
23/10/2017 NOC025
23/10/2017 NOC024
23/10/2017 NOC023
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.