Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Arise Church
ARISE Church
CC30589
9429043126620
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 38228
Wellington Mail Centre
Petone
Lower Hutt
5045
3 Pito-One Road
Korokoro
Lower Hutt
5012

Charity's other details

04 499 0477
04 499 0478
https://www.facebook.com/ARISEchurchNZ


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

ARISE Church is about an amazing team of people inspired by their relationship with God, and wanting to make a difference in the lives of others - whether it be positive environments for children, engaging programmes for teenagers, opportunities for community engagement for young workers, marriage counselling for couples, parenting tips for families, hospital visitations, support for those grieving, life skills training, open homes, positive role models or in any one of a myriad of other ways.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, International activities, Economic development

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Arise Productions Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2023 $10,242,631 $13,011,613 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 9/06/2022 $15,938,317 $12,884,655 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 29/06/2021 $12,969,889 $10,645,882 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 29/06/2020 $13,782,405 $13,316,090 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 27/06/2019 $13,314,246 $11,469,171 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2018 $11,742,712 $9,237,046 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2017 $5,836,156 $4,691,647 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 21/12/2016 $10,618,753 $8,073,544 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 22/12/2015 $8,176,082 $7,642,565 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Prabashini Govender Trustee 24/04/2024
Dean Andrew Halvorson Trustee 1/10/2023
Amber Simonne Moore Trustee 7/09/2023
Stephen David Woolley Trustee 28/06/2023
Richard David Teal Chairperson 21/04/2023
Joseph Selwyn Bundy-Cooke Trustee 7/09/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Andrew Robertson Trustee 31/12/2023
Leonard Teleaga Solomona Trustee 12/09/2023
Benjamin John Kendrew Trustee 23/08/2023
Alistair Papali'i-Curtin Trustee 1/07/2023
Kylie Reenie Fletcher Trustee 30/04/2023
Anna Pasikale Trustee 31/03/2023
Alice Louise Camaivuna Trustee 1/12/2022
Robert William Reid Trustee 31/10/2022
Israel Faithful Cooper Trustee 31/08/2022
Graeme Robert Kirkwood Trustee 30/07/2022
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/04/2024 NOC053
15/02/2024 NOC052
14/02/2024 NOC051
2/10/2023 NOC050
15/09/2023 NOC049
26/07/2023 NOC048
26/07/2023 NOC047
30/05/2023 NOC045
4/05/2023 NOC044
21/04/2023 NOC043
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.