pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Society For Music Therapy Incorporated
Music Therapy New Zealand
CC30597
9429042688631
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 19319
Avondale
Auckland
1746
151 Pirongia Road
RD 6
Ness Valley
Te Awamutu
3876

Charity's other details

027 675 0666
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/MusicTherapyNewZealand


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objects of the Society are to: (a) raise awareness and understanding of music therapy; (b) advance the provision of music therapy to all who will benefit from these services; (c) maintain standards of ethical practice to protect the safety of all clients; (d) advance research of music therapy in a range of settings, including the health and education sectors; (e) provide funding for study, research and activities that aim to advance the provision of music therapy in specific areas where there is an identified need; and (f) develop relationships with relevant stakeholders. The objects of the Society shall reflect the cultural diversity of New Zealand and have due regard to the Treaty of Waitangi.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Other (please state)

(Education and health)

General public

Client groups of music therapists

Entity Structure

The New Zealand Society for Music Therapy Incorporated is a society incorporated under the Incorporated Societies Act 1908 and a charity under the Charities Act 2005. It is governed by a Council, elected every two years by members, and made up of music therapist and friend members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $330,457 $153,188
30/09/2021 30/09/2021 $176,924 $129,639
31/12/2020 16/12/2020 $183,303 $256,479
30/09/2019 10/09/2019 $144,589 $113,122
30/09/2018 20/09/2018 $177,373 $98,544
30/09/2017 27/09/2017 $91,728 $82,160
30/09/2016 29/09/2016 $95,809 $74,685
30/09/2015 25/08/2015 $102,644 $38,073
30/09/2014 2/09/2014 $74,913 $38,571
30/09/2013 2/08/2013 $91,532 $64,828

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andrew John Tierney Council Member 29/09/2022
Jingyuan Kong Council Member 25/09/2022
Philippa Louise Algie Council Member 25/09/2022
Rachel Austin Council Member 25/09/2022
Sophie Leila Sabri Council Member 25/09/2022
Stephen Guerin Chairperson 25/09/2022
Helen Dowthwaite Executive Officer 1/04/2022
Ella Maria Polczyk-Przybyla Council member 18/07/2021
Linda Webb President 9/11/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Katie Rose Elise Pureti Council member 28/08/2022
Helen Sian Dowthwaite Chair 30/11/2021
Lara Katrina Scott Executive Officer 1/11/2021
Amanda Reid Council Member 21/09/2021
Lauren Elizabeth Payne Council member 15/08/2021
Yvonne MacSweeny Council Member 15/08/2021
David Patrick O'Beirne Council Member 6/05/2021
William John Darbyshire Council Member 28/04/2021
Alicia Stewart Council Member 13/09/2020
Devin Brooks Council Member 13/09/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/09/2022 NOC035
1/09/2022 NOC034
17/06/2022 NOC033
17/06/2022 NOC032
26/11/2021 NOC030
28/09/2020 NOC027
13/06/2019 NOC025
27/05/2019 NOC024
21/09/2018 NOC022
23/01/2017 NOC020

Charity Documents