Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Waitangi National Trust
CC31198
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 48
Paihia
247
Tau Henare Drive
Waitangi
Paihia, Bay Of Islands

Charity's other details

09-4027437


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Waitangi National Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Waitangi Limited
Waitangi National Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To maintain the historic precinct of the Waitangi Treaty Grounds

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Arts / culture / heritage

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, Employment, Sport / recreation, Care / protection of animals, International activities, Economic development, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Organisation established under other legislation (e.g. under the Community Trusts Act 1999)

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Willow-Jean Prime Trustee 25/06/2024
David Rankin Trustee 6/12/2023
John Taylor Thompson Trustee 15/10/2023
Lisa Tumahoi Trustee 15/10/2023
Benjamin Grant Dalton Chief Executive 1/09/2023
Belinda Ward Trustee 4/11/2022
David Hugh John Dunsheath Trustee 26/10/2018
Anita Marie Woodfield CFO 2/10/2017
Hugh Geoffrey Cotterill Trustee 16/06/2017
Tania Joy Te Rongingangana Simpson Trustee 16/06/2017
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Peeni Ereatara Gladwyn Henare Trustee 8/02/2025
Shane Reti Trustee 15/03/2024
Ralph Johnson Acting CEO 1/10/2023
Greg McManus CEO 1/09/2022
Wallace Te Ahuru Corporate Services Manager 6/10/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/05/2025 NOC016
18/09/2015 NOC005
6/04/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.