Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Te Roopu Pookai Taaniwhaniwha Incorporated
CC31231
9429042847199
Deregistered
02/02/2014
This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity has been wound up and assets have been distributed.

Below are details of Te Roopu Pookai Taaniwhaniwha Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 2/02/2014 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity has been wound up and assets have been distributed.
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 50577
Porirua
5240
213 Bedford Street
Cannons Creek
Porirua
5024

Charity's other details

04 237 9608
04 238 9350


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Peer Support

Community development

Education / training / research, Health, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Mental Health Community

Other (please state)

(Mental Health Consumers), Children / young people, General public, Family / whanau


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2013 31/12/2013 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2012 31/12/2012 21/11/2012 $529,034 $546,032 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2011 31/12/2011 15/11/2011 $460,327 $448,571 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2010 31/12/2010 3/05/2011 $317,226 $299,374 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2009 31/12/2009 31/12/2009 $238,040 $233,700 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Te Wera Kotua Committee Member 12/05/2009
Areta Koopu Committee Member 27/11/2007
Egan James Bidois Commitee Member 27/11/2007
Malcolm Robson Committee Member 27/11/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Pauline Rangi Wikohika Committee Member 1/07/2012
Colin Karel Slade Committee Member 30/06/2012
Anne Voogd Committee Member 1/07/2011
Dennis Tamatea Committee Member 1/07/2011
Haunui Carroll Committee Member 1/07/2011
Mervyn Simeon Committee Member 1/07/2011
Tau Siilima Feite Committee Member 30/06/2010
Henrietta Smith Committee Member 12/05/2009
Peter Hunter Deputy Chairperson 12/05/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/11/2012 AR005
3/05/2011 AR003
31/12/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.