pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Product Stewardship Foundation
CC31327
9429043051649
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 1216
Hastings
4156
207 Karamu Road North
Hastings 4122
Hastings
4122

Charity's other details

021 922595
06 870 8137


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote model product stewardship policies, programmes and legislation; researching technical issues; and helping agencies, organisations and companies develop viable solutions; and To bring key stakeholders together to reach voluntary negotiated agreements on specific products; and To hold developed programmes on behalf of industry groups and organisations (both public and private); and To serve as a clearing house for information as a network for product stewardship education, training and development in New Zealand; and To maintain tracking systems and associated data for recycling and waste and provide services and information to interested parties; and To pursue every object or purpose within New Zealand which in accordance with the laws of New Zealand for the time being is charitable.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Environment / conservation

General public

stakeholder organisations and their members with an interest in product stewardship

Entity Structure

Governance: The Trust is governed by 3 sitting Trustees. Management & Operations: As pieces of sector work come online, this is currently contracted out to appropriately qualified consultants. Administration & Compliance: Currently 3R Group Limited donates time and disbursements to keep the Trust up to date.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 26/08/2021 $0 $0
30/09/2020 24/08/2020 $70 $64
30/09/2019 19/08/2019 $0 $42
30/09/2018 16/08/2018 $0 $648
30/09/2017 5/04/2018 $28 $48
30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $0 $48
30/09/2015 20/11/2015 $0 $126
30/09/2014 21/09/2014 $63,069 $67,894
30/09/2013 13/05/2014 $128,271 $122,692
30/09/2012 29/08/2012 $0 $180

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Adele Rose Trustee 31/12/2015
Graeme Norton Trustee 31/12/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Neville Smith Trustee 1/04/2018
Dougal Morrison Trustee 31/12/2015
Mark Herbert George Gilbert Trustee 31/12/2015
Robert Cameron Brodnax trustee 31/12/2015
Graeme Douglas Norton trustee 29/02/2012
James Bruce Emerson trustee 23/07/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/08/2020 NOC017
24/08/2020 NOC016
26/07/2018 NOC011
29/08/2012 AR006
3/04/2012 NOC004
16/06/2011 NOC003
12/08/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents