Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Rotary Club of Bishopdale Burnside Charitable Trust
CC31387
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 20059
Bishopdale
Christchurch
8543
108 Harakeke Street
Fendalton
Christchurch
8014

Charity's other details

03 348 3264


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Promoting for the advancement of literacy and numeracy, improving our community by meeting the needs of aged, infirm and those affected by public health needs, promoting the development of leadership and vocational skills in the community, improving public amenities, providing assistance to other charities through hands on service, fundraising and sponsorship, providing assistance to communities in times of disaster, and any other assistance to benefit the community

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

Children / young people

Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 24/12/2023 $190,047 $127,591 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 13/12/2022 $3,135 $71,821 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 19/12/2021 $196,108 $123,920 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 22/12/2020 $6,817 $57,915 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 23/12/2019 $236,863 $263,396 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 7/12/2018 $95,136 $79,622 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 18/12/2017 $151,901 $109,331 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 21/12/2016 $90,938 $87,355 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 16/12/2015 $111,846 $105,023 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 23/12/2014 $70,218 $75,531 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Eoin David Keith Trustee 30/06/2022
Peter Frederick Lowe Trustee 24/11/2020
Robert Wilson Gerring Trustee 30/06/2018
Elizabeth Anne Shackleton Trustee 15/11/2017
Alistair Cyril Coleman Trustee 9/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Neale McPherson Trustee 30/06/2022
Keith Walker trustee 24/11/2020
Wayne Malcolm Carlisle Trustee 30/06/2018
Eoin David Keith Trustee 15/11/2017
John Francis Walsh Trustee 23/11/2013
Katherine Samantha Russell Trustee 31/08/2011
Ian Mccurdy Murray Trustee 29/11/2010
John Macdonald Taylor Trustee 30/11/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/08/2022 NOC015
4/07/2022 NOC014
2/07/2018 NOC009
23/12/2013 NOC006
15/12/2011 AR004
14/12/2010 NOC003
30/11/2009 AR002
3/11/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.