pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Music Whakatane
N/A
CC31426
9429042979968
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
January 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Whakatane Music Society 30/06/2008
Music Whakatane 27/09/2018

Address for service

PO Box 132
Whakatane
3158
42 Melville Drive
Whakatane 3120
Whakatane
3120

Charity's other details

(07) 308 4061
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/whkmusicsoc


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To foster music in the Whakatane district by: 1) Arranging & promoting public concerts by visiting national & international musicians. 2) Arranging performance opportunities for local adult & student musicians. 3) Encouraging the work of local music teachers. 4) Giving donations to local groups and individuals to further their musical activities. 5) Cooperating with other music and performing arts groups, locally, regionally & nationally.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Community development

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people

Entity Structure

A trust governed by a Board of between 2 and 12 trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2023 2/05/2023 $17,181 $19,401
31/07/2022 18/05/2022 $11,610 $12,440
31/07/2021 15/08/2021 $8,641 $8,486
31/07/2020 15/08/2021 $7,891 $1,410
31/07/2019 11/05/2019 $12,306 $13,444
31/07/2018 27/01/2019 $10,128 $5,100
31/07/2017 25/07/2017 $25,003 $16,432
31/07/2016 6/08/2016 $17,225 $18,904
31/07/2015 30/06/2015 $16,704 $17,671
31/07/2014 29/07/2014 $2,655 $3,329

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Robin Michael Lane officer member 12/09/2022
Laura Adana Austin Committee Member 28/07/2017
John Warner Haldane vice president 17/03/2014
Thomas Frank Bayliss President 17/03/2014
Caroline Stewart Committee member 26/03/2013
Rosemary Hall Secretary 25/03/2013
Gaylene Bland Committee member 30/03/2011
Mary Floerence Cassaidy Committee member 26/03/2008
Sanja Baresic Treasurer 26/03/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rachael Zelda King Committee Member 1/04/2022
Susan Greenwood Treasurer 18/06/2019
Christopher Chapman Treasurer 9/04/2018
Manda Wilson Committee member 12/05/2017
Elizabeth Margaret Bayliss Secretary 15/05/2016
Laura Edana Austin Treasurer 15/05/2016
Linda Dorothy Roberts Committee 3/05/2015
Pamela Louise Williams Committee 3/05/2015
John Warner Haldane Committee 17/03/2014
Thomas Frank Bayliss President 17/03/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/09/2022 NOC028
16/04/2022 NOC026
18/09/2019 NOC023
27/06/2019 NOC022
27/09/2018 NOC018
25/09/2018 NOC017
28/07/2017 NOC016
28/07/2017 NOC015
28/07/2017 NOC014
16/07/2016 NOC012

Charity Documents