Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The South Seas Health Care Trust
No
CC31558
9429043100675
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 61033
Otara
Auckland
2159
Shop 9-12
14 Fair Mall
Otara
Auckland
2159

Charity's other details

09 2739017


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The relief of poverty in Pacific communities within New Zealand. The advancement of education in Pacific communities within New Zealand, and providing health and social services to Pacific communities within New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Health & Social Wellbeing Provider), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Other (please state)

(Pacific communities within New Zealand)

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 15/02/2025 14/02/2025 $17,912,189 $25,756,453 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2023 $41,219,319 $35,748,724 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 14/12/2021 $13,562,653 $13,462,126 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 21/12/2020 $7,970,085 $7,953,338 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 22/10/2019 $5,833,335 $5,665,720 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 12/12/2018 $5,282,314 $4,959,851 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 21/12/2017 $4,553,758 $4,278,642 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 16/12/2016 $4,218,898 $3,974,690 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 28/01/2016 $4,114,210 $3,356,300 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 29/01/2015 $4,097,273 $3,668,012 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dr Florina Chan Mow Trustee 7/05/2024
Hon. Aupito William Sio Interim Chairperson 7/05/2024
Teuila Percival Deputy Chair Person 7/05/2024
Rudolf Laumatia Trustee 9/06/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Emele Palamo Trustee 28/02/2025
Siosaia K Tutone Trustee 10/05/2024
South Seas Innovations Limited Corporate Trustee 7/05/2024
Tamara Anderson Board Secretary 7/05/2024
Faamau Levi Trustee 6/05/2024
Malia Tuai Trustee 6/05/2024
Ellerton Lavea Board Secretary 17/03/2022
Loana Tanielu Trustee 24/01/2022
Atoa Peter Petaia Trustee 7/12/2018
Bernadette Pereira Trustee 29/11/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/04/2025 NOC028
23/05/2024 NOC026
15/05/2024 NOC025
15/05/2024 NOC024
14/05/2024 NOC023
8/05/2024 NOC022
29/03/2023 NOC019
31/05/2022 NOC018
14/08/2018 NOC013
24/04/2018 NOC012
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.