Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Normandale School Parent Teachers Association
Friends of Normandale School (FoNS)
CC31777
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

C/O Normandale School
16 Martin Grove
Normandale
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details

04 566 2010
04 566 2011
https://www.facebook.com/FoNSEvents/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The aim of the Association is to advance education by: (a) raising money for Normandale School, for the benefit of children attending the School; (b) bringing about greater cooperation between the parents,teachers and community of the School; (c) cooperating with the teachers and Board of Trustees for the benefit of children attending the School.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Fund-raising

Education / training / research

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Parent Teacher Association

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 7/07/2024 $28,788 $28,432 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 28/06/2023 $22,540 $17,271 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2022 $23,849 $22,097 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2021 $16,864 $20,188 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2020 $20,086 $25,753 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 19/05/2019 $4,369 $3,431 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 15/06/2018 $12,766 $13,007 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 29/06/2017 $17,249 $15,773 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 3/06/2016 $18,903 $12,800 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sarah Rigby co-president 20/03/2023
Lauren Jones Treasurer 19/06/2022
Mia Bui Secretary 28/10/2020
Kirsty Anderton President 6/11/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Amber Thomas President 15/03/2022
Anna Christina Gilhooly Secretary 3/07/2020
Rebecca Marie Shakespeare Treasurer 6/11/2019
Jennifer Colville Secretary 12/03/2019
Kelly Ellwood Treasurer 22/02/2018
Michaela Hebden Chairperson 31/12/2017
Vida Rye Treasurer 27/02/2017
Sam Williams Chairperson 3/03/2016
Tracy Ann Taylor Secretary 3/03/2016
Jo Wishnowsky Treasurer 3/03/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/06/2022 NOC019
29/06/2017 NOC013
29/06/2017 NOC012
3/06/2016 NOC011
25/06/2015 NOC010
17/06/2014 NOC009
10/06/2014 NOC008
14/07/2012 NOC005
14/07/2012 NOC004
30/06/2012 NOC003
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.