pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Laura Fergusson Trust Wellington Incorporated
CC31977
9429042640400
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

18 Laura Fergusson Grove
Fairfield
Lower Hutt
5011

Charity's other details

04 5676024
04 567 4754


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The primary activities of the Trust is the provision of services and facilities to meet the needs of the disabled community, their families and the funding bodies within the health and disability sector. In addition the Trust is also focused on providing expert rehabilitation services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

People with disabilities

Accommodation / housing

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

The trust is Incorporated under the Incorporated Societies Act 1957 and registered as a charity under the Charities Act 2005.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 22/11/2023 $8,721,719 $8,607,926
31/12/2022 9/01/2023 $8,358,064 $8,384,635
31/01/2022 21/03/2022 $7,814,344 $7,429,417
31/12/2020 29/10/2020 $5,349,982 $5,347,008
31/12/2019 5/11/2019 $4,682,180 $4,248,956
31/12/2018 30/10/2018 $4,343,769 $4,059,101
31/12/2017 18/02/2018 $4,046,794 $3,865,692
31/12/2016 13/12/2016 $3,934,758 $3,774,884
31/12/2015 9/02/2016 $3,631,297 $3,405,519
31/12/2014 16/12/2014 $3,346,851 $3,400,973

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Deborah Anselm Trustee 21/04/2022
Vanessa Balshaw Trustee 21/04/2022
John Emmerson Trustee 13/02/2020
Fiona Ross Trustee 18/10/2018
Michael John Markham Trustee 18/10/2018
ANGELA IRENE FOSTER Trustee 10/12/2014
Virginia Grainer Trustee 20/02/2010
Cameron Madgwick Trustee 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sophi Rose Trustee 19/10/2023
Helen Cruse Trustee 4/11/2021
John Charles Kennedy-good Trustee 10/10/2019
Alison Margaret Molloy Trustee 30/08/2019
Patrick Gerard Sheehan Trustee 18/10/2018
Brian Joseph Walshe Trustee 31/03/2018
Gregory John Coyle Trustee 31/03/2018
Charlotte Von Dadelszen Trustee 7/10/2015
Robert James Handyside Trustee 25/03/2015
Philippa Williams Trustee 29/02/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/11/2023 NOC016
12/05/2022 NOC014
15/12/2014 NOC006
18/01/2013 AR005
23/12/2011 AR004
23/12/2010 AR003
23/12/2009 AR002
17/03/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents