Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Big Brothers Big Sisters of New Zealand
BBBSNZ
CC32216
9429043116744
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

109 Blenheim Road
Riccarton
Christchurch
8041
300 Great South Road
Greenlane
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

0272244865
https://www.facebook.com/BBBSNewZealand
https://twitter.com/BBBSNZ
https://www.instagram.com/BBBSNZ/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objective of the Trust is to establish, implement and enhance Big Brothers Big Sisters Programmes throughout New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

National Youth Mentoring Organisation

Other (please state)

(Youth Mentoring), Social services, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The entity is a Trust which is governed by a Board of Trustees. The Trust is a registered Charitable Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 12/01/2025 $640,881 $604,196 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 13/11/2023 $464,894 $466,896 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 4/12/2022 $342,061 $294,447 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 12/01/2022 $108,784 $92,389 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 15/02/2021 $101,229 $66,584 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 30/03/2020 $49,351 $80,439 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 15/08/2018 $20,686 $46,150 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 15/08/2018 $67,136 $65,681 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 20/01/2017 $48,175 $106,611 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 21/12/2015 $114,600 $147,195 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kasey-Anne Pasene Trustee 1/03/2022
Joe Graham Trustee 1/11/2021
Michael John McSkimming Smith Trustee 1/02/2021
Paul Clarke Warren Chair 16/03/2020
Michael Henry Woodward Treasurer 21/05/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ross David Lienert Trustee 23/11/2024
Teresa Marie Monahan Secretary 3/12/2022
Elaine Ford Chair 3/08/2021
Alexander Gordon Mann Trustee 30/06/2021
Tanya Louise Cooke Trustee 30/09/2020
Sean Andrew Thomas Secretary 3/10/2019
Sam Stephen McMullan Trustee 26/11/2018
Sam McMullan Officer 21/06/2016
Sarah Gibson Trustee 21/06/2016
Sandy Gill Individual 28/11/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/04/2022 NOC031
6/04/2022 NOC030
20/08/2021 NOC028
26/07/2021 NOC027
4/11/2020 NOC025
3/11/2020 NOC024
30/03/2020 NOC022
22/11/2019 NOC021
26/11/2018 NOC020
31/08/2018 NOC019
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.