Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Branches Christian Community
Nil
CC32354
9429042595748
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

C/- S Dempsey
78 Cottle Road
RD2 Henderson
Auckland
0782

Charity's other details

09 8108227
no
no
no
no


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To become involved in a helping relationship with a person or persons in need by provision of accommodation or by any other means that the Trustees shall from time to time decide.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Building - one two bedroom home rental accommodation.)

Accommodation / housing

Education / training / research, Religious activities

Other (please state)

(Tenants )

Entity Structure

A charity governed by trustees who adhere to the Trusts Statement of Faith. The Board shall consist of not less than 3 nor more than 12 Trustees. Trust to have a Chairperson, Treasurer and Secretary. Meetings to be when neccessary. In Person or by phone, email or zoom.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 28/09/2024 $17,422 $9,822 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 30/09/2023 $17,027 $12,447 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 19/08/2022 $13,106 $16,435 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 29/09/2021 $10,874 $9,518 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 2/09/2020 $11,616 $15,876 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 15/07/2019 $10,879 $3,056 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 24/06/2018 $10,315 $9,076 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 10/07/2017 $10,249 $12,012 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 14/06/2016 $9,942 $12,258 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Amy Louise Rabey Trustee 17/09/2023
Deborah Grace Rabey Trustee 24/06/2018
Michael Anthony Rabey trustee 7/07/2013
Tilda Rabey Trustee/Secretary 7/07/2013
Albert Glas Trustee 12/08/2007
Dennis Grant Dempsey Trustee/ chairperson 12/08/2007
Elizabeth Glas Trustee 12/08/2007
Helena Round trustee/treasurers asistant 12/08/2007
Sandra Lillias Dempsey Trustee / Treasurer 12/08/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Robert Allan Round Trustee 24/06/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/09/2020 NOC013
25/06/2018 NOC009
19/01/2017 NOC007
19/01/2017 NOC006
11/07/2013 NOC001
26/07/2010 AR003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.