Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Turangi Volunteer Fire Brigade
CC32408
N/A
Registered

Registration details

8/10/2008
June 30

Address for service

16 Ohuanga Road
Turangi
3334

Charity's other details

073868580
www.facebook.com/TurangiFire/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Turangi Fire Brigade is a 100% volunteer based emergency service provider to the wider Southern Lake District. This includes the Turangi township and nearby settlements of Motuoapa, Waitetoko, Tokaanu, Pukawa and Kuratau. We have 35 members that volunteer ensuring that our local community and surrounding areas are protected 24 hours a day, 365 days a year. These emergency incidents include, hazardous chemical incidents, structure fires, motor vehicle accidents, medical assists, and so on. In addition to our emergency role, we are leaders in the “prevention first” strategy. We are proactive in promoting all aspects of fire safety to all sectors of our community as well as attendance and advocation at local community events. This includes Early Childhood Centre and School visits to deliver Firewise & fire safety education programs, Marae visits as part of the Ngati Tuwharetoa Marae Fire Safety Initiative, home fire safety checks and smoke alarm drives.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Fire Service and Rescue), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Other (please state)

(New Zealand Fire and Rescue Service), Emergency / disaster relief, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Entity Structure

The Turangi Volunteer Fire Brigade is made up of; Chief Fire Officer, Secretary, Treasurer, Station Officers, Executive Management Team, and Volunteer Firefighters making a total of 35 volunteer members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 5/10/2023 $50,906 $39,738 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 13/09/2023 $78,755 $29,264 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 19/12/2021 $41,407 $45,073 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 14/10/2020 $32,706 $29,305 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 2/10/2019 $43,229 $35,939 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 11/12/2018 $36,954 $33,024 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 30/12/2017 $90,109 $35,490 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 21/02/2017 $56,413 $67,385 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 18/08/2015 $30,609 $27,460 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 10/11/2014 $50,866 $47,969 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Peter Hanne Cheif Fire Officer 7/08/2023
Te Amo Leslie Kingi Secretary & Admin 24/09/2016
Christal Morrison Treasurer & Special Project Manager 19/09/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tangonui Kingi Chief Fire Officer 6/08/2023
Gabrielle Packer Assistant Treasurer 17/08/2019
Bevan Louis Topp Deputy Chief Fire Officer Acting 22/01/2013
Richard Bruce Lange Station Officer 22/01/2013
Raymond Francis Bray Chief Fire Officer 10/05/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/11/2022 NOC014
16/11/2021 NOC012
11/04/2016 NOC006
22/01/2013 NOC003
5/09/2011 AR004
8/04/2010 NOC002
18/09/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.