pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The New Zealand National Parks and Conservation Foundation Board of Trustees
NZ Nature Fund
CC32894
9429043074471
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 31
Cromwell
9342
29 The Mall
Cromwell
9310

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/nznaturefund.org


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Trust is to undertake or facilitate the undertaking of projects, scientific enquiries or the provision of educational opportunities which have the potential to enhance the enjoyment by the Public of their experience of National Parks and other areas in NZ having high conservation values whilst protecting and conserving the bio-diversity of NZ.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Environment / conservation

General public

Animals, Native flora and fauna

Entity Structure

To receive gifts donations and bequests and to invest and administer those funds so as to enable the Foundation to provide financial support for conservation oriented projects and activities in NZ.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2022 2/08/2022 $715,780 $461,216
30/09/2021 29/07/2021 $568,915 $628,955
30/09/2020 10/07/2020 $538,282 $455,334
30/09/2019 12/06/2019 $498,514 $418,882
30/09/2018 26/07/2018 $339,451 $365,442
30/09/2017 29/06/2017 $519,409 $35,963
30/09/2016 21/09/2016 $8,132 $2,127
30/09/2015 30/09/2015 $7,416 $910
30/09/2014 18/09/2014 $6,717 $1,498

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jonathan Eriksen Trustee of the Trust 1/04/2022
Lewis Vernon Sanson Trustee of the Trust 1/04/2022
Charlotte Louise Fisher Chairperson 10/10/2020
Jules Fulton Trustee of the Trust 1/10/2019
Evan Blackman Trustee of the Trust 1/07/2019
Lady Prue Wallis Trustee of the trust 1/06/2004
Denis William Anson Marshall Trustee of the trust 1/06/2000

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michael Fisk Trustee of the Trust 21/04/2021
Kate Smith Trustee of the Trust 19/04/2021
Andrew Gordon Archer Trustee of the Trust 28/01/2021
James Murray McKee Trustee of the trust 11/12/2020
Mark Christensen Trustee of the trust 1/09/2019
John Stewart Ombler Trustee of the Trust 8/06/2019
Richard Alexander Riddell Trustee of the Trust 7/06/2019
Stuart Russel Henderson Trustee of the trust 1/04/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/03/2022 NOC024
28/05/2021 NOC022
16/02/2021 NOC021
11/02/2021 NOC020
13/01/2021 NOC019
17/04/2020 NOC017
13/06/2017 NOC013
8/05/2017 NOC012
5/05/2017 NOC011
5/05/2017 NOC010

Charity Documents