Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Assistance Dogs New Zealand
CC32920
9429043165674
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 36406
Merivale
Christchurch
8146
213 Lichfield Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

0800966342
https://www.facebook.com/assistancedogsnewzealandtrust


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Assistance Dogs New Zealand (ADNZT) charitable purpose is to enrich the lives of people living with disability by providing purpose bred and trained Assistance Dogs, to meet the unique needs of each individual client and family.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Trains dogs for persons with disability

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Care / protection of animals, Fund-raising

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Animals, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

ADNZT is a registered charitable organisation which operates under the governance of a Board of Trustees, who provide leadership and strategic direction to ADNZT staff to deliver an effective Assistance Dogs service to clients living with disabilities.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 31/12/2023 30/11/2023 $1,670,494 $1,198,039 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 26/09/2022 $914,542 $871,149 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 9/12/2021 $782,899 $635,067 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 24/11/2020 $761,530 $730,536 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 13/12/2019 $519,128 $640,268 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 31/07/2018 $708,152 $678,588 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 24/10/2017 $529,863 $596,153 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 21/11/2016 $676,748 $447,703 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 20/03/2016 $346,317 $336,230 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 8/01/2015 $157,645 $153,535 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Craig Andrew Vickery Board Trustee 1/03/2023
Brodie Jean Kane Board Trustee 6/10/2022
Catherine Breanna Joe McNeill Board Trustee 6/10/2022
Sarah Jane von Dadelszen Board member 6/10/2022
Elizabeth Mary Oliver Board Trustee/Secretary 13/09/2018
Sinead Horgan Board Trustee / Chairperson 1/08/2018
Leanne Milligan Board Trustee/Treasurer 1/10/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michelle Anne Arrowsmith Board Trustee 24/11/2023
Sophie Elizabeth Kennedy Board Trustee 24/02/2023
Andrew McLean Board Trustee 8/09/2022
Logan Cayton McMullen Board Trustee 6/06/2022
Wendy Youens Board Trustee 27/06/2019
Joy Ngaire Marslin Board Trustee 14/03/2019
Sharon Threadwell Board Trustee 1/10/2018
Brett Jeffery Vice Chairperson / Board secretary 31/03/2018
Amanda Jackson Board Trustee, Client Representative 1/01/2017
Jacque Patterson Board Trustee, Financial Controller 1/01/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/11/2023 NOC058
26/06/2023 NOC057
23/03/2023 NOC056
19/12/2022 NOC055
13/10/2022 NOC054
11/10/2022 NOC053
26/05/2022 NOC051
5/06/2021 NOC047
31/05/2021 NOC046
31/07/2019 NOC042
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.