Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Sunday Classics Incorporated
Christopher's Classics
CC33216
9429042942375
Deregistered
01/11/2024

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$32,175
$0

The Charity’s accumulated assets and income have been:


Below are details of Sunday Classics Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 1/11/2024 The charity is merging or has merged with another registered charity
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 20087
Bishopdale
Christchurch
8543
Unit 53
Burlington Village
Marshland
Christchurch
8051

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To encourage, promote and support music in all its forms with an emphasis on performance.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Musicians Performers. Main Activity: Services to musicians)

Arts / culture / heritage

Other (please state)

(Musicians), Children / young people, General public

Entity Structure

Sunday Classics is an incorporated Society.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 17/02/2024 $47,165 $47,655 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 6/03/2023 $57,770 $66,191 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 9/01/2022 $55,897 $50,491 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 15/04/2021 $67,413 $51,289 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 10/08/2020 $45,210 $42,531 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 23/03/2019 $51,890 $47,543 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 26/06/2018 $41,241 $39,208 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 12/06/2017 $36,044 $35,748 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 29/06/2016 $37,149 $35,785 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 25/05/2015 $35,264 $35,231 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mark Stephen Hickman Chairman 16/02/2020
Doris Beryl Barnard Treasurer/Secretary 10/04/2018
Helen Patricia Webby Committee 1/06/2017
Elizabeth Anne Bills Committee 16/04/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michael Snowdon Rendl Marshall Committee 30/07/2022
Christopher John Marshall Committee 7/04/2022
Rosamund Westbrooke Committee 21/03/2021
Diane Hargest Moir Committee 16/02/2020
Judith Catherine Derrick Committee 16/02/2020
Nicholas John Derrick Secretary 16/02/2020
Maryan Hoorens van Heyningen Committee 31/12/2017
Iain Stephen Brandram-Adams Committee Member 31/12/2015
Peter Reginald Pexton Treasurer 13/03/2015
Marion Anne Simpson Treasurer 15/04/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/08/2022 NOC020
10/08/2022 NOC019
9/08/2022 NOC018
24/03/2019 NOC014
28/05/2018 NOC010
5/03/2015 NOC007
31/05/2013 AR006
25/06/2012 AR005
28/05/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.