Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Friends of Waiuta Incorporated
CC33634
9429042704331
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 493
Greymouth
7840
10 Fernhill Place
Karoro
Greymouth
7805

Charity's other details

03 7687118
n.a .
n.a.


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To undertake and foster projects and activities that lead to the advancement of learning, understanding and enjoyment of the history of Waiuta and the Blackwater Mines.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Arts / culture / heritage

Environment / conservation, Fund-raising

General public

Entity Structure

Friends of Waiuta is an Incorporated Society. We have a Management Committee and three meetings a year held with our members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 28/06/2023 $19,528 $53,888 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 28/04/2022 $77,192 $32,144 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 29/06/2021 $28,610 $25,046 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 15/09/2020 $73,892 $55,284 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 10/10/2019 $42,039 $13,146 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 5/09/2018 $40,213 $73,395 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 4/09/2017 $51,980 $4,897 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 14/06/2016 $11,179 $13,797 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 21/10/2015 $9,095 $17,901 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 9 months from 1 April 2020 to 31 December 2020.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Peter Edward Kerridge vice president (one of two) and acting treasurer 18/03/2023
Margaret Elaine Sadler President 31/03/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Paul McGirr Treasurer 18/03/2023
Pauline Barnett Secretary 18/03/2023
Paul Gerard McGirr Chairman 1/01/2021
Aileen Janice Morris Treasurer 28/04/2018
Aileen Janice Morris Secretary 28/04/2018
Lawerence Anisy Secretary 31/05/2016
Graham Farrant Secretary 31/03/2015
Tracey Anne Hampton Treasurer 31/03/2015
Frances Mary Hunter Chairperson 22/10/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/09/2020 NOC013
9/10/2019 NOC011
11/05/2017 NOC008
16/03/2017 NOC007
21/05/2015 NOC005
29/11/2010 AR003
27/01/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.