Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


World Wide Fund for Nature New Zealand
CC33788
9429042927716
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 11514
Manners Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6142
Floor 2
108 The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0800 4357 993
https://www.facebook.com/wwfnewzealand/
https://twitter.com/WWFNewZealand
https://www.linkedin.com/company/wwf-new-zealand/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

WWF’S MISSION IS TO BUILD A FUTURE WHERE PEOPLE LIVE IN HARMONY WITH NATURE. We work to stop the degradation of the planet’s natural environment, by conserving the world’s biodiversity, ensuring the use of renewable natural resources is sustainable, and promoting the reduction of pollution and wasteful consumption.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Community development, International activities, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Animals

Entity Structure

WWF-New Zealand has a central office in Wellington. The work of the organisation is also supported by volunteers around the country.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 10/12/2023 $3,060,165 $2,840,519 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 5/12/2022 $4,744,748 $5,703,282 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/01/2022 19/01/2022 $3,780,745 $3,866,510 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 22/12/2020 $3,812,991 $4,003,680 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 10/12/2019 $5,594,212 $4,774,311 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 7/12/2018 $4,122,577 $4,273,028 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 23/11/2017 $4,583,260 $4,720,539 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 14/11/2016 $4,990,362 $5,035,137 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 1/12/2015 $4,255,942 $4,320,261 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 18/12/2014 $3,393,788 $3,293,835 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nicola Douglas Trustee 11/02/2022
Lou Sanson Trustee 10/11/2021
Matthew Valentine Trustee - Chair 10/11/2021
Jonathan Parker Mason Trustee 15/08/2018
Ian Samuel Knowles Trustee 16/05/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kaapua Smith Trustee 6/12/2023
Libby Harrison Trustee- Chair 1/06/2022
Justine Daw Trustee 11/02/2022
Jan Sedgwick Trustee 1/02/2022
Elizabeth Oliver Trustee 4/08/2021
Katherine Short Trustee 8/11/2020
Rauru Kirikiri Trustee 13/11/2019
Rachel Jane Brown Trustee 31/07/2019
Morgan Williams Trustee- Chair 8/05/2019
John Hay Trustee 21/11/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/12/2023 NOC039
30/11/2023 NOC038
10/07/2023 NOC037
19/07/2022 NOC035
11/04/2022 NOC034
15/06/2021 NOC032
23/12/2020 NOC030
15/01/2020 NOC029
5/12/2019 NOC027
1/10/2019 NOC026
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.