Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Westland Industrial Heritage Park Incorporated
CC33871
9429043143689
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
May 31

Address for service

PO Box 100
Hokitika
7842
9 Brian Waugh Lane
Hokitika 7810
Hokitika
7810

Charity's other details

022 0432877


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To recover, restore, interpret and display relics of the Westland District industrial past that are relevant and viable, (to retain the remaining industrial heritage of the West Coast for current and future West Coasters, and the visiting public on the West Coast, and in particular in Hokitika under long term controlled conditions). To develop and operate a miniature heritage themed bush railway to raise funds for the Charitable purposes above.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Preservation, restoration and maintenance of historic machinery and other industrial artifacts from Westland.

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, Social services, Industrial Heritage

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/05/2024 30/11/2024 29/11/2024 $79,139 $113,551 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2023 30/11/2023 28/11/2023 $72,128 $27,903 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2022 30/11/2022 28/11/2022 $45,501 $14,999 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2021 30/11/2021 29/11/2021 $18,975 $17,057 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2020 30/11/2020 24/11/2020 $18,974 $15,465 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2019 30/11/2019 27/11/2019 $150,287 $26,768 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2018 30/11/2018 29/11/2018 $53,919 $36,466 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2017 30/11/2017 3/04/2018 $49,680 $32,664 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/05/2016 30/11/2016 29/03/2018 $40,672 $27,063 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 25/08/2015 $156,050 $148,563 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Robert Gaiger President 20/11/2024
Robert John Daniel Treasurer 1/06/2015
Ian Philip Gilbertson Secretary 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bruce Leslie Hackett President 31/07/2024
Robert Ian Gaiger President 10/07/2021
Murray Bain Past President 31/05/2020
mort cruikshank president 31/05/2015
Ray Schimanski Treasurer 31/05/2015
Jim Staton President 27/06/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/11/2024 NOC018
26/11/2021 NOC014
27/10/2020 NOC012
25/10/2019 NOC010
15/01/2018 NOC007
7/10/2013 AR006
29/06/2012 AR005
5/01/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.