pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Dunedin Civic Orchestra Incorporated
Dunedin Symphony Orchestra
CC34031
9429042662273
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 5571
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9054
65 Hanover Street
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

03 477 5623
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/DunedinSymphonyOrchestra
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/DunedinSymphony


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Dunedin Civic Orchestra Inc. is: (a) To administer and promote the Dunedin Civic Orchestra Inc. and/or any other orchestras, groups or performers that the Society may elect from time to time to foster and encourage. (b) To present concerts and entertainments of whatever kind to members of the Society and the general public for any of the purposes of the Society and to fix and levy charges for admission to such concerts, entertainments or any other activity organised by the Society. (c) To foster, promote and encourage the study, composition, practice and performance of music in all its branches, especially orchestral music in orchestral concerts or as an accompaniment to choral and theatrical works, opera, ballet and any other works. (d) To employ, train and promote generally the interests of musicians and other artists, both collectively and as individuals. (e) To provide workshops, studios etc and make these available to Society members.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Presentation of orchestral performances)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Older people

Entity Structure

The governing entity's members meet annually at an Annual General Meeting and elect seven of the nine members of the Board. The other two Board members are elected by the players as soon as is practicable after the AGM. The Board appoints its President, Vice-President and Treasurer. It also employs the General Manager. The Board meets monthly and considers the activity and financial reports. The General Manager employs the artists and administrative staff.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

The first annual return due on the 31/12/2008 will cover less than six months after the charity is registered. For this reason the charity should be granted an exemption to filling their first annual return under s41 (1), and the first annual return will be due by the 31/12/2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 13/05/2021 $898,732 $813,754
30/06/2020 3/11/2020 $1,039,732 $999,370
30/06/2019 1/11/2020 $933,476 $938,231
30/06/2018 10/06/2018 $876,482 $932,644
30/06/2017 26/07/2017 $1,188,870 $913,476
30/06/2016 3/07/2016 $872,966 $897,510
30/06/2015 27/06/2015 $719,765 $722,247
30/06/2014 26/06/2014 $875,818 $916,661
30/06/2013 5/06/2013 $799,673 $775,463
30/06/2012 23/05/2012 $881,269 $890,651

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rachel Fiona Elizabeth Barton Board member 4/05/2021
Ruth Helena Thomson Board member 28/04/2021
Rhodes Haddon Vivian Donald Board member 2/11/2020
Anthony Damian Ritchie Board member 27/03/2019
Shelagh Anne Murray Board member 27/03/2019
Diana Hudson Board member 31/03/2016
Megan Lisa Bartlett Board member 31/03/2016
Andrew George Alastair Hamilton Board member 25/03/2015
Nicholas Mark Cornish Board member 25/03/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alison Joan Bowcott Board member 28/04/2021
Sharon van Turnhout Board member 28/04/2021
Ruth Meserve Houghton Board member 27/07/2020
Brian Russell Tegg Board member 27/03/2019
Graeme Alexander Downes Member Board of Management 27/03/2019
Brendan James Gray Board member 28/03/2018
Hamish Ralph Miller Member Board of Management 24/05/2017
Kathleen E Grant Member Board of Management 31/03/2016
Dean Kenneth Hollebon Member Board of Management 25/03/2015
Kenneth Lister Member Board of Management 25/03/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/04/2016 NOC006
23/05/2012 AR005
15/06/2011 AR004
8/06/2010 AR003
30/06/2009 AR002
18/12/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents