Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Migrating Kitchen Trust
CC34041
9429043185467
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

20 Mariri Road
Kelburn
Wellington
6012

Charity's other details

0274 575695
https://www.facebook.com/MigratingKitchen


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The primary objects within New Zealand for which the Trust is established are:- (i) To encourage and provide opportunities for people in Aotearoa New Zealand to showcase their culture, to celebrate their history and to share their stories in exhibitions, media and public events so that through knowledge, barriers are broken, tolerance and understanding emerge. (ii) To promote public education programmes in Aotearoa New Zealand through partnership with ethnic communities living here, in order to celebrate racial diversity, promote tolerance and understanding, and to foster peace through showcasing culture, festivals, families and food. (iii) To affiliate and cooperate with organisations with similar aims and objects. (iv) To provide information for refugees and migrants and organisations supporting refugees and migrants. (v) To evaluate the effectiveness of the programmes through research with the intention of promoting the programmes throughout New Zealand. (vi) To carry on any

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(The Migrating Kitchen Trust raises funds for all the activities: exhibitions, festivals, documentary films and public events.)

Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 9/10/2024 $423 $384 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 29/09/2023 $221 $360 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 30/09/2022 $107 $339 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 29/09/2021 $134 $1,229 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $134 $1,229 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 25/09/2019 $174 $2,022 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 27/09/2018 $2,096 $7,323 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 27/09/2017 $1,928 $4,704 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 29/09/2016 $22,720 $15,981 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Adibah Saad Trustee 31/01/2020
Emily-Jane Marie Griffin Trustee 31/01/2020
Leila Sherry Goddard Trustee 1/12/2016
Anna Catherine Cottrell Trustee 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mabel Makombore Trustee 30/01/2020
Hui-ping Wu Trustee 31/08/2019
Anna Locker-Lampson Trustee 31/12/2017
Lobat Reais-Parsi Trustee 4/05/2016
Rob Hole Trustee 4/08/2015
David James Underwood Trustee 31/03/2015
Judith Estranna Aitken Trustee 31/03/2013
Jennifer Kay Bush-Daumec Trustee 13/06/2012
Kitiona Tauira Trustee 3/10/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/06/2020 NOC021
31/08/2019 NOC019
15/03/2018 NOC017
30/09/2016 NOC015
29/09/2016 NOC013
10/09/2015 NOC012
17/04/2015 NOC011
4/09/2013 AR006
27/07/2012 AR005
27/10/2011 AR004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.