Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Waiheke Resources Trust
Waiheke Resources Trust
CC34108
9429042952435
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The Waste Resource Trust 30/06/2008
The Waiheke Resources Trust 7/02/2011

Address for service

1A Mako Street
Oneroa
Waiheke Island
1081

Charity's other details

093722915
https://www.facebook.com/waihekeresourcestrust/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Vision Waiheke’s diverse community is connected, empowered, skilled and supported to actively protect and enhance the natural and social fabric of our island and the planet for future generations. Mission To be a hub providing the Waiheke community, and people visiting our shores, with inspiration, exemplars, guidance, skills and opportunities to treasure and actively nurture the island’s natural environments. The purpose of the Waiheke Resources Trust is to: Undertake projects, and programmes which maximise sustainable practice on Waiheke. Provide the Waiheke community with information, inspiration, innovation, exemplars and education to make ethical, effective and powerful decisions in respect of sustainability. Undertake and generate community development initiatives, including community activism, on Waiheke for the benefit of people and our environment. Provide training and assist people on Waiheke to gain knowledge and skills in sustainable practice. Develop a model for small

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), education to schools, community organisations and households

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Community development, Employment, Economic development

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 12/12/2024 $1,053,309 $1,081,992 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 27/03/2024 $1,133,712 $1,125,474 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 23/08/2023 $1,173,401 $1,167,647 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 15/06/2022 $1,255,044 $1,215,188 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 28/02/2021 17/03/2021 $588,147 $556,814 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 16/10/2019 $456,103 $451,948 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 12/12/2018 $461,605 $409,449 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 14/01/2018 $315,180 $302,249 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 19/07/2017 $336,304 $315,601 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 2/01/2016 $136,710 $127,481 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andrea Bennett Trustee 24/02/2025
Haley Jayne Wilson Trustee - Treasurer 4/11/2024
Robert Barry Hobson Coates Trustee 4/11/2024
Sarah Wiggins Trustee 30/06/2024
Francisco Ignacio Blaha Trustee 26/05/2024
Mark Francis Russell Trustee - Chair 30/08/2023
Nicola Leigh Elmore Trustee 29/04/2022
Wendy Leslie Hamilton Trustee 29/04/2022
Michael Maahs CEO 5/09/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Denise Maree Roche Trustee 24/02/2025
Michael Joao Tavares Trustee 24/02/2025
Claire Denise Mortimer Trustee 29/07/2024
Bill Kinghorn Trustee 23/06/2024
Beini Guo Trustee 27/05/2024
Ivan Charles Kitson Trustee 15/10/2023
John Matthew Stansfield Trustee 15/10/2023
Bronwyn Shirley Carruthers Trustee 8/08/2023
Miro Matariki Fisch trustee 29/11/2021
Steven Alan Northover Trustee 29/11/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/03/2025 NOC060
21/02/2025 NOC059
6/11/2024 NOC057
15/07/2024 NOC055
27/06/2024 NOC054
30/05/2024 NOC053
29/05/2024 NOC052
29/05/2024 NOC051
15/10/2023 NOC047
6/10/2023 NOC045
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.