Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Essentially Men Education Trust
Essentially Men
CC34239
9429043124176
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

94 Avocado Lane
RD 5
Mangawhai
Wellsford
0975

Charity's other details

021 259 8790
www.facebook.com/MenBeingReal/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To enhance the health and well-being of society by focusing on positive ways of being for men and boys, through promoting educational programmes, public awareness, leadership, community development and research.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Essentially Men runs educational programmes that focus on positive ways of being for men and boys.

Education / training / research

Health, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, Education / Social Service

Other (please state)

(Men And Boys), Children / young people, General public, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 30/09/2024 $249,062 $235,263 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 17/09/2023 $248,778 $210,743 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/11/2022 23/11/2022 $223,938 $217,034 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/12/2021 9/12/2021 $185,196 $183,995 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 31/12/2020 8/01/2021 $238,717 $180,598 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/11/2019 22/11/2019 $195,346 $169,028 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/11/2018 3/12/2018 $271,871 $248,006 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 5/10/2017 $233,394 $228,231 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 20/11/2016 $254,213 $230,902 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Terence Greenslade Chairman 17/04/2025
Michael Cranna Trustee 23/11/2023
Marcel Brian Bear Trustee 17/06/2021
Rayna Love Trustee 19/11/2020
Andrew Yelverton Trustee 16/08/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Phillip Rice Chairperson 17/04/2025
Greg Newman-Watt Trustee 13/02/2025
Paul Watson Chairperson 13/02/2025
Michael Cranna Trustee 17/03/2023
Geoff Duncan Trustee 16/09/2021
Dennis Michael Wickstead Trustee 17/12/2020
Barry John Vautier Trustee 15/09/2020
Richard Aplin Trustee 21/05/2020
Luke Sniewski Trustee 11/10/2019
Ocean Paul Numan Trustee 24/05/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/05/2025 NOC033
17/02/2025 NOC031
10/01/2025 NOC030
7/01/2025 NOC029
23/07/2024 NOC027
6/07/2023 NOC025
5/11/2021 NOC022
3/06/2020 NOC020
3/06/2020 NOC019
3/06/2020 NOC018
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.