Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Top of the South Community Foundation
CC34345
9429043190997
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Nelson Bays Community Foundation 30/06/2008
Top of the South Community Foundation 10/12/2019

Address for service

C/- Malloch Mc Lean
315 A Hardy Street
Nelson
7040

Charity's other details

0278569752


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The mission of the Top of the South Community Foundation is to inspire and enable generosity to benefit our local community forever. We encourage people to leave a gift in their will (and/or) during their lifetime to benefit the wider Tasman, Nelson, Marlborough region. The capital remains intact, annual distributions are made from individual's endowment funds and the distributions are made locally. At the heart of everything we do is building strong communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Community development

Other charities

Voluntary bodies other than charities, General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Top of the South Community Foundation Limited CC45256

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 January 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 January 2010.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 17/12/2024 $1,164,784 $257,420 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 3/10/2023 $711,802 $257,154 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 20/10/2022 $4,911,414 $130,836 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 19/10/2022 $228,868 $22,049 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/11/2020 1/01/2021 $35,002 $21,477 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 6/12/2019 $358,298 $40,636 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $51,221 $42,757 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $133,047 $57,507 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $32,804 $57,832 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jane Nicola Peterson Trustee 24/09/2024
William Barton Rainey Trustee 24/09/2024
Annette Christa Stow EO 10/07/2023
Roy Murray Dawson Trustee 21/07/2022
Anissa Jean Bain Trustee 14/10/2020
David John Ashcroft Chair 16/08/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ailie Suzuki Trustee 26/11/2024
Nicholas Peter Moore Trustee 24/09/2024
William Norman Agnew Trustee 24/09/2024
Timothy Edward Saunders Trustee 20/12/2022
Dene Gavin Trustee 23/10/2020
Elizabeth Jane Crawshaw Trustee 10/04/2019
Julie Elwynne Varney Trustee 10/11/2018
Jeremy Charles Barton Trustee 9/11/2017
Robin Whalley Trustee 9/11/2017
Alan Keith Hinton Officer 8/11/2016
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/10/2023 NOC039
30/08/2023 NOC037
30/06/2021 NOC034
22/11/2020 NOC032
11/12/2019 NOC031
11/12/2019 NOC030
10/12/2019 NOC029
26/09/2018 NOC026
20/02/2018 NOC025
27/11/2017 NOC024
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.