pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The International Association of Infant Massage- New Zealand Chapter Trust
IAIM NZ
CC34350
9429042876601
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
International Association of Infant Massage New Zealand Chapter 30/06/2008
The International Association of Infant Massage- New Zealand Chapter Trust 31/08/2020

Address for service

1 Glenview Terrace
Saint Martins
Christchurch
8022

Charity's other details

03 332 5559


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

IAIM NZ is a Chapter of the International Association of Infant Massage. The Mission Statement is: “The Purpose of the International Association of Infant Massage is to promote nurturing touch and communication through training, education, and research so that parents, caregivers and children are loved, valued and respected throughout the world community.” The New Zealand Chapter seeks to achieve this through supporting the NZbased IAIM trainer who teaches members of the public and health professionals to become Certified Infant Massage Instructors (CIMIs) who then go on to teach infant massage to parents/carers. IAIM NZ promotes those courses. IAIM NZ also supports its CIMI members so that they can continue to encourage nurturing touch and communication between parents and their babies which promotes bonding and attachment.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Health

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people

Entity Structure

The IAIM NZ Chapter is a registered Charity operating with a Trust Board which includes the roles of President, Vice President and Treasurer. There are no staff employed by IAIM NZ.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 13/09/2023 $3,731 $6,589
30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $4,477 $2,603
30/09/2021 30/09/2021 $6,877 $1,545
30/09/2020 31/08/2020 $9,687 $2,510
31/10/2019 30/09/2019 $4,632 $2,944
30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $12,059 $7,574
30/09/2017 11/09/2018 $20,603 $15,944
30/09/2016 26/02/2017 $21,376 $14,805
30/09/2015 5/08/2015 $24,580 $22,704
30/09/2014 10/08/2014 $32,782 $33,359

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Joanne Claire Carter Secretary 27/06/2022
Paula-Jane Patricia McCrea Vice President 27/06/2022
Joanne Marie Osborne President 12/08/2015
Vida Rye Treasurer 12/08/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Karen Magrath Vice President 22/07/2022
Yossarian Fay Secretary 27/06/2022
JOHN Nicholas Mears OSBORNE Treasurer 27/09/2019
Alison Jean Trethewey Trustee 12/08/2015
Michael Henry Dawson Trustee 12/08/2015
Peggy Elizabeth Dawson Trustee 12/08/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/08/2018 NOC008
4/10/2016 NOC006
12/08/2015 NOC005
12/08/2015 NOC004

Charity Documents