Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Free Wesleyan Church of Tonga in New Zealand Trust Board
Sutt Church
CC34403
9429042721543
Deregistered
10/02/2015
This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Free Wesleyan Church of Tonga in New Zealand Trust Board at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 10/02/2015 This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

143 Favona Road
Favona
Auckland
2024

Charity's other details

09 275 8740
09 275 8738


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Employment

Religious groups

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 11/02/2015 $1,135,945 $1,181,191 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2012 30/06/2013 11/02/2015 $1,067,913 $1,035,431 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2011 30/06/2012 20/07/2012 $1,107,787 $1,062,776 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2010 30/06/2011 25/07/2011 $840,065 $716,929 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2009 30/06/2010 23/07/2010 $1,231,309 $701,883 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2008 30/06/2009 8/07/2009 $1,241,881 $502,616 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Joel Tuita Mataitinii Fotu Trustee / Legal Adviser 25/08/2006
Frederick Feki Trustee / Secretary General 20/06/2006
Mosese Manoa Trustee / Head Steward 19/06/2004
Viliami Tu'itupou Trustee / Deputy Head Minister 19/06/2003

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Isileli Tonga Trustee / Secretary / Treasurer 31/12/2010
Lilybeth Tautuaa Trustee/Financial Adviser 31/12/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/07/2012 AR005
25/07/2011 AR004
23/07/2010 AR003
8/07/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.