Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Ruapekapeka Trust
Ruapekapeka Pa Management Trust
CC34646
9429042993483
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Te Ruapekapeka Pa Management Trust 30/06/2008
Te Ruapekapeka Trust 24/12/2019

Address for service

9 Wynyard Street
Kawakawa
0210

Charity's other details

0272207277


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To protect and preserve the mana whenua and to ensure the taha wairua of Te Ruapekapeka is maintained To work in equitable partnership with the Department of Conservation and co-operatively with other agencies and stakeholders to ensure that Te Ruapekapeka is maintained protected and upheld

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Preservation historic site)

Other (please state)

(Preservation historic site), Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage

Other (please state)

(Historians and tourists), Children / young people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Trust shall be administered by the Management Trust who shall be accountable to and elected by Ngati Manu, Ngati Kahukuri(Ngati Hau) , Ngati Hine, Te Kapotai and Ngapuhi Tonu. The committee shall include ex-officio representation of the Department of Conservation.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 31/05/2024 $61,918 $52,776 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 19/05/2023 $650,000 $87,730 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 7/04/2022 $231,126 $352,795 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 17/10/2021 $586,945 $217,685 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 29/09/2021 $104,000 $31,435 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 13/01/2020 $161 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 31/07/2018 24/12/2019 $970 $3,104 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 25/09/2017 $970 $3,104 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 8/06/2016 $3,162 $3,280 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Linda Te Awhi Pare Ngahiriwa Hepi Trustee 10/02/2022
Geneva Tui Hildreth Trustee 22/11/2021
Thelma Myra Thorne Trustee 22/11/2021
Kay Kawari Davis Trustee 25/01/2021
Marion Anne Wikaire Trustee 30/05/2019
Peter William Tipene Trustee 30/05/2019
William Phillip Alexander Cherrington Trustee 30/05/2019
Phoebe Aroha Davis Trustee 4/05/2019
Shelley Kawiti-Jessop Trustee 25/05/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lillian Lily George Trustee 2/02/2022
Wattie Himiona Cooper Trustee 25/10/2021
Karen Te Ira Herbet Trustee 18/08/2021
Allan Halliday Trustee 15/12/2020
Johnson Davis Trustee/Treasurer 30/10/2019
Willow-Jean Prime Trustee 30/05/2019
Te Pora Kauwhata Trustee 1/01/2017
Peeni Ereataka Gladwyn Henare Trustee 31/12/2015
Raumoa Kawiti Trustee 31/12/2015
Te Raa Nehua Trustee 31/12/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/02/2022 NOC021
13/12/2021 NOC020
2/10/2021 NOC017
30/09/2021 NOC014
4/05/2020 NOC013
24/12/2019 NOC011
24/12/2019 NOC009
25/02/2015 NOC007
4/12/2012 AR007
8/12/2011 AR005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.