Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Acts Churches Trust
ACTS Churches New Zealand
CC34921
9429042582151
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Apostolic Church Trust Board 30/06/2008
Acts Churches Trust 27/01/2016

Address for service

PO Box 97082
Manukau City
Auckland
2241
15 Gladding Place
Manukau
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Impacting our world for Christ through partnerships of effective local churches, accredited ministers and ascension ministries.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, International activities

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Not for profit charitable trust governed by its council and board of trustees.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Apostolic Church Development Trust CC31943

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 11/09/2024 $1,164,229 $891,245 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 27/08/2023 $1,000,901 $813,292 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 9/09/2022 $910,268 $661,659 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 24/08/2021 $1,025,766 $762,354 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 20/08/2020 $1,202,863 $1,075,776 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 25/09/2019 $1,185,503 $984,221 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 4/07/2018 $1,148,589 $944,601 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 27/09/2017 $2,089,824 $998,078 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 2/09/2016 $1,000,848 $899,181 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Byron Marchant Trustee 16/11/2023
Barrett Donald Ruakere Trustee 18/06/2020
Jacob Daniel Langridge Trustee 18/06/2020
Lawrence Paul Kirby Trustee 18/06/2020
Sheridyn Rodgers Trustee 20/06/2019
Samuel Hamilton Monk Trustee 1/09/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Desiree Nicole Levy Trustee 28/02/2024
Stephen Rex Graham Trustee 30/06/2023
Wayne Swift Trustee 18/06/2020
Bruce Monk Trustee 16/06/2020
Ian Douglas Wright Trustee 19/06/2019
Jordan Kingsley Smith Trustee 27/09/2017
Sheridyn Barker Rodgers Trustee 27/09/2017
Steven Rex Graham Trustee 27/09/2017
Lyle Penisula Trustee 16/06/2015
Paul Edmund Bennett Trustee 26/06/2013
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/02/2024 NOC028
16/11/2023 NOC027
20/10/2023 NOC026
29/09/2020 NOC022
21/09/2020 NOC021
21/09/2020 NOC020
2/07/2019 NOC017
14/12/2017 NOC015
11/10/2017 NOC014
24/03/2016 NOC011
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.