pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Christchurch Catholic Diocesan Development Fund
CC35662
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 4544
Christchurch
8140
Unit 2
9 Washington Way
Sydenham
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

03 366 9869


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The nature of the operations and principal activities of the Fund are to generate funds to assist the Roman Catholic Bishop of the Diocese of Christchurch to undertake his pastoral activities and to support the development of resources within the Catholic community. This is achieved by offering call and term deposit facilities and using the funds raised to invest in loans to the Catholic community for development or to externally invest to generate income.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Fund-raising

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Fund is a Trust established by the Roman Catholic Bishop of the Diocese of Christchurch by Deed of Trust dated 21 December 1967 and is domiciled in New Zealand. The trustees are appointed by the Roman Catholic Bishop of the Diocese of Christchurch.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2022 29/08/2022 $677,000 $322,000
30/09/2021 5/07/2021 $1,230,000 $507,000
30/09/2020 13/08/2020 $1,128,000 $763,000
30/09/2019 31/07/2019 $1,665,000 $841,000
30/09/2018 28/06/2018 $1,702,000 $782,000
30/09/2017 30/08/2017 $1,806,000 $831,000
30/09/2016 28/09/2016 $1,671,000 $1,369,000
30/09/2015 29/09/2015 $1,984,000 $1,046,000
30/09/2014 28/09/2014 $2,031,000 $1,556,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kintilla du Boucher-Ryan Trustee 22/10/2020
Graeme John Wilson Trustee 1/02/2019
Terence James Leo Foote Trustee 28/06/2016
Simon Christopher Roughan Trustee 18/02/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michael Gerard Schimanski Trustee 28/06/2022
Richard James Bailey Trustee 14/04/2022
Sarah Ellen Barrer Trustee 1/07/2020
Rob Farrell Trustee 5/04/2019
Renee Walker Trustee 8/05/2018
Phillip John Baird Trustee 27/06/2017
John Joseph O'Donnell Trustee 23/07/2015
Desmond James Boyle Trustee 30/06/2015
Derek John Craze Trustee 24/06/2014
George Webster MacFarlane Trustee 24/06/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/05/2022 NOC018
24/06/2021 NOC016
4/02/2021 NOC015
28/06/2019 NOC012
22/08/2017 NOC009
13/04/2016 NOC007
4/12/2015 NOC006
29/09/2015 NOC005
29/09/2014 NOC004
6/10/2011 AR004

Charity Documents