pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Network For Women In Dairying
Dairy Women's Network
CC35685
9429043133994
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
May 31

Address for service

PO Box 1468
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3240
Level 1
450 Anglesea Street
Hamilton City
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 974 4850
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/dwn.co.nz/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/dairy_women
https://www.youtube.com/user/DairyWomensNetworkNZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Today's dairy women are multi-talented, capable and influential and the Dairy Women's Network works alongside our members to give them additional skills to take them to the next level in their careers. The Network's purpose is to develop and educate women and men to add value to the business of dairying. Our members have access to professional and personal support through a mix of face to face gatherings and web based contact, which includes Workshop training programme, regional meetings and internet forums.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Mentor And Leadership

Other (please state)

(Women involved in Dairy Industry - farmers and others), Animals, General public

Entity Structure

Dairy Women's Network is funded by DairyNZ farmers levy and commercial partners to deliver Workshop training programmes, regional meetings and internet forums. DWN has a base of volunteer regional leaders within the regions.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/11/2022 3/11/2022 $955,442 $945,153
30/11/2021 9/11/2021 $1,128,753 $1,118,717
30/11/2020 5/11/2020 $1,067,508 $1,037,205
30/11/2019 5/11/2019 $1,165,194 $1,118,021
30/11/2018 7/11/2018 $1,181,968 $1,127,553
30/11/2017 15/11/2017 $1,106,912 $1,197,199
30/11/2016 14/11/2016 $1,242,426 $1,214,573
30/11/2015 30/11/2015 $1,485,603 $1,197,038
30/11/2014 27/11/2014 $1,498,880 $1,453,800
30/11/2013 29/11/2013 $1,133,422 $1,184,136

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lucy-Jane Johnson Trustee 28/02/2023
Jenna Smith Trustee 5/06/2020
Patricia Ann Rankin Chair 5/06/2020
Rachel Haskew Trustee 5/06/2020
Karen Forlong Deputy Chair 14/06/2016
Mark Heer Trustee 10/02/2016
Donna Smit Trustee 18/09/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sophie Stanley Trustee 26/10/2022
Pamela Storey Trustee 28/10/2020
Alison Gibb Trustee 5/06/2020
Tracy Brown Trustee 30/11/2019
Cathy Jean Brown Chair 31/10/2019
Justine Kidd Chair, Trustee 20/10/2016
Christine Rae Stevens Trustee 12/05/2016
Hilary Webber Trustee 15/10/2015
Maree Crowley-Hughes Trustee 17/09/2015
Angela Margaret Fullerton Trustee 22/10/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/03/2023 NOC038
28/03/2022 NOC036
9/11/2020 NOC034
2/11/2020 NOC032
8/06/2020 NOC031
10/01/2020 NOC030
10/01/2020 NOC029
4/11/2019 NOC027
18/07/2019 NOC026
14/03/2018 NOC024

Charity Documents