Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Kupeka Tiaki Taoka – Southern Regional Collections Trust
Te Kupeka Tiaki Taoka – Southern Regional Collections Trust
CC35893
9429042728689
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Southland Museum and Art Gallery Trust Board 30/06/2008
Te Kupeka Tiaki Taoka – Southern Regional Collections Trust 6/12/2023

Address for service

223-233 Boxall Street
Tisbury
Invercargill
9812

Charity's other details

03 219 9069
03 218 3872


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The enhancement, preservation and maintenance of the collection are the principal responsibilities of the Board.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(The enhancement, preservation and maintenance of the collection are the principle responsibilities of the Board.)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009. This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 30 June 2013 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 17/10/2024 $1,330,181 $1,314,904 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 20/11/2023 $1,277,142 $1,370,063 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 14/12/2022 $1,298,171 $1,235,807 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2022 27/06/2022 $2,202,347 $2,207,232 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 21/12/2020 $2,165,505 $2,241,470 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 2/12/2019 $2,185,914 $2,211,766 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 16/10/2018 $1,806,976 $3,380,414 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 29/11/2017 $1,770,915 $2,101,964 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 14/12/2016 $1,816,342 $1,636,502 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 30/11/2015 $1,590,547 $1,446,381 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Cyril Raymond Gilroy Trustee 18/12/2024
Tracey Lee Wright-Tawha Trustee 18/12/2024
Dougal Rex Austin Trustee 22/08/2023
Jane Louise Stanton Trustee 22/08/2023
Lewis Vernon Sanson Trustee 22/08/2023

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Evelyn Anne Cook Trustee 18/12/2024
Teina Moana Herzer Trustee 3/11/2024
Katie Robinson Trustee 21/08/2024
David Gerard Hall-Jones Trustee 4/08/2024
Cameron Alastair McIntosh Trustee 22/08/2023
Michael Emanuel Day Trustee 22/08/2023
Stephen Francis Parry Trustee 22/08/2023
Stephen Francis Pary Trustee 28/04/2023
Clare Valerie Hadley Trustee 20/03/2023
Brett Richard Highsted Trustee 5/05/2022
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/01/2025 NOC041
17/01/2025 NOC040
26/11/2024 NOC039
8/10/2024 NOC036
7/10/2024 NOC035
4/09/2024 NOC034
12/07/2024 NOC033
6/06/2024 NOC032
12/12/2023 NOC030
18/09/2023 NOC027
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.